EP3607632 - RECEPTACLE INDUCTIVE CHARGING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hubbell Incorporated 40 Waterview Drive P.O. Box 1000 Shelton, CT 06484 / US | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORTUN, Sorin 225 Taxter Road Irvington, NY 10533 / US | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18780330.9 | 03.04.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018US25853 | Priority number, date | US201762481382P | 04.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762481382 P | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018187304 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3607632 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H02J7/02, H02J50/10, H04B5/00 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J50/90 (US);
H02J7/0042 (EP,US);
H02J7/0044 (US);
H02J50/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Title | German: | INDUKTIVE LADEVORRICHTUNG MIT AUFNAHME | [2020/07] | English: | RECEPTACLE INDUCTIVE CHARGING DEVICES | [2020/07] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE CHARGE INDUCTIFS DE RÉCEPTACLE | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 28.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015207350 (CHEN SHIH CHUNG [TW], et al) [I] 1* paragraphs [0028], [0032], [0033], [0038];; figures 3, 6 *; | [XI]US2017025886 (ROHMER RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0134], [0137], [0141], [0166], [0183], [0220];; figures 1A-1F, 22, 23B * [I] 7,9,10,12,13 | International search | [A]US2008157715 (ROSENBOOM VOLKER [DE], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2012318941 (GOURLEY JAMES ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US8575887 (POMARE EDUARDO [US]) [Y] 15 * entire document *; | [A]US2015188356 (CHEN CHENG-PANG [TW], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [XY]US2017025886 (ROHMER RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 6, 9, 10 * entire document * [Y] 15 |