EP3608187 - PARKING ASSISTANCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, NL | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clarion Co., Ltd. 7-2, Shintoshin Chuo-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-0081 / JP | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEJIMA Noriyasu c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
OGATA Takehito c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
ISHINODA Makoto c/o CLARION CO., LTD. 7-2 Shintoshin Chuo-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 330-0081 / JP | 04 /
TAGAWA Shinya c/o CLARION CO., LTD. 7-2 Shintoshin Chuo-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 330-0081 / JP | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18780385.3 | 28.03.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018JP12720 | Priority number, date | JP20170077106 | 07.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017077106 | [2020/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018186253 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608187 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3608187 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/06, B60R99/00, B62D6/00, G08G1/16, B62D15/02 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
B62D15/0285 (EP,US);
G08G1/168 (EP);
G01C21/34 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/07] | B60W30/06, B60R99/00, B62D6/00, G08G1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PARKHILFEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/07] | English: | PARKING ASSISTANCE DEVICE | [2020/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AIDE AU STATIONNEMENT | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2019 | Translation filed | 07.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 18.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2010156671 (LEE WEI-CHIA [DE], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0015] , [0016] , [0022] , [0037] , [0039]; figure -; claim - * [A] 2-7; | [A]DE102011086281 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0007] - [0010]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]JP2017052434 (CLARION CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0006] , [0016] , [0017] , [0047] , [0050]; figure -; claim - * | International search | [A]JP2001018821 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-8* , paragraphs [0011]-[0012], [0048], [0076], fig. 19-23 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007062623 (EQUOS RES CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0188]-[0189] (Family: none) *; | [XA]JP2017052434 (CLARION CO LTD) [X] 1, 8 * , paragraphs [0006], [0016]-[0017], [0047], [0050], fig. 2-4 (Family: none) * [A] 2-7 | by applicant | JP2010208392 |