EP3607290 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACOUSTICALLY DETECTING FLUID LEAKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB, IE | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tenova Goodfellow Inc. 10 Kingsbridge Garden Circle, Suite 601 Mississauga, ON L5R 3K6 / CA | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCCINI, Marco 2107-5 Michael Power Place Toronto, Ontario M9A 0A3 / CA | 02 /
SCIPOLO, Vittorio 1951 Rathburn Road East, Suite 123 Mississauga, Ontario L4W 2N9 / CA | [2021/35] |
Former [2020/10] | 01 /
LUCCINI, Marco 2107-5 Michael Power Place Toronto, Ontario M9A 0A3 / CA | ||
02 /
SCIPOLO, Vittorio 1951 Rathburn Road East Suite 123 Mississauga Ontario L4W 2N9 / CA | |||
Former [2020/07] | 01 /
LUCCINI, Marco 1911 - 3 Summerland Terrace Toronto, Ontario M9A 0B4 / CA | ||
02 /
SCIPOLO, Vittorio 1951 Rathburn Road East Suite 123 Mississauga Ontario L4W 2N9 / CA | Representative(s) | Cosenza, Simona Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18780613.8 | 22.02.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018CA00033 | Priority number, date | US201762481753P | 05.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762481753 P | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018184089 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3607290 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3607290 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 11.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/00, F22B37/38, F23M5/08, F27D1/12, F27D21/00 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
F23M5/08 (EP);
G01M3/2807 (US);
F27B3/24 (EP);
F27B3/28 (EP);
F27D1/12 (EP);
G01M3/243 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AKUSTISCHEN DETEKTION VON FLUIDLECKS | [2020/07] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACOUSTICALLY DETECTING FLUID LEAKS | [2020/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION ACOUSTIQUE DE FUITES DE FLUIDE | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 08.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.05.2022 | CZ | 25.05.2022 | DK | 25.05.2022 | EE | 25.05.2022 | FI | 25.05.2022 | HR | 25.05.2022 | LT | 25.05.2022 | LV | 25.05.2022 | MC | 25.05.2022 | RO | 25.05.2022 | RS | 25.05.2022 | SI | 25.05.2022 | SK | 25.05.2022 | SM | 25.05.2022 | BG | 25.08.2022 | NO | 25.08.2022 | GR | 26.08.2022 | IS | 25.09.2022 | PT | 26.09.2022 | GB | 22.02.2023 | IE | 22.02.2023 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/44] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | FI | 25.05.2022 | |
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 25.05.2022 | |
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 25.05.2022 | |
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 25.05.2022 | |
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6389881 (YANG BAO-WEN [US], et al); | [A]WO2007042277 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO2012159208 (HATCH LTD [CA], et al) | International search | [A]US7940189 (BROWN GREGORY C [US]); | [A]US8365581 (BUEHRING HEIKO [DE]); | [A]US8751101 (WEBER OLAF [US], et al); | by applicant | US6389881 | WO2007042277 | WO2012159208 |