EP3606998 - LOW EMISSION POLYOXYMETHYLENE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ticona LLC 8040 Dixie Highway Florence, KY 41042 / US | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Sung Hye 8040 Dixie Highway Florence Kentucky 41042 / US | 02 /
LUO, Rong 8040 Dixie Highway Florence Kentucky 41042 / US | 03 /
KINDT, Jared T. 8040 Dixie Highway Florence Kentucky 41042 / US | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/07] | Herr, Ulrike Maria Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18780886.0 | 06.04.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018US26439 | Priority number, date | US201762483108P | 07.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762483108 P | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018187678 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606998 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L59/02, C08K5/05, C08K5/17, C08K5/21, C08K5/3445, C08K5/3492, A61M5/178, A61M15/00, C08L59/04 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
C08L59/02 (EP,US);
A61M5/178 (EP,CN,US);
A61M15/00 (EP,CN,US);
C08G2/08 (US);
C08K5/005 (US);
C08K5/0083 (US);
C08K5/16 (US);
C08K5/175 (EP,US);
C08K5/21 (CN);
C08K5/31 (US);
C08K5/3445 (EP,CN,US);
C08K5/3492 (EP,CN,US);
C08L59/04 (EP,US);
C08L61/02 (US);
A61M15/0001 (US);
A61M2205/02 (EP,US);
A61M2207/10 (EP,US);
A61M5/31 (US);
C08L2203/02 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/175, C08L59/02 (EP);
C08K5/21, C08L59/02 (CN);
C08K5/3445, C08L59/02 (US,CN,EP);
C08K5/3492, C08L59/02 (EP,CN,US) |
Former IPC [2020/07] | C08L59/02, C08K5/05, C08K5/17, C08K5/21, C08K5/3442, C08K5/3492 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Title | German: | EMISSIONSARME POLYOXYMETHYLENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/07] | English: | LOW EMISSION POLYOXYMETHYLENE COMPOSITION | [2020/07] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYOXYMÉTHYLÈNE À FAIBLE ÉMISSION | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 26.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004010064 (HARASHINA HATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,10,11 * paragraph [0020]; example 16 * * paragraphs [0160] , [0175] , [0176] , [0179] * [I] 4,5,7-9,12,14,15; | [X]US2006052492 (HARASHINA HATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11 * examples 48,59,63 *; | [XA]US7638565 (HARASHINA HATSUHIKO [JP]) [X] 1 * example 16 *[A] 2-15 | International search | [Y]US2007123617 (HARASHINA HATSUHIKO [JP]) [Y] 3-5, 10-13, 28, 29 * entire document *; | [XY]US2011034610 (MULHOLLAND BRUCE M [US]) [X] 1, 2, 6 * entire document * [Y] 3-5, 10-13, 28, 29; | [Y]US2013324675 (LUO RONG [US], et al) [Y] 28, 29* entire document * |