EP3606400 - PATIENT INTRODUCER ALIGNMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Auris Health, Inc. 150 Shoreline Drive Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2022/10] |
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states Auris Health, Inc. 150 Shoreline Drive Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRAPER, Jeffrey William 150 Shoreline Drive Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 02 /
MARTINEZ, Sergio L. Jr. 150 Shoreline Drive Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 03 /
CONNOLLY, Ryan Jeffrey 150 Shoreline Drive Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 04 /
JIANG, Allen 34532 Northstar Terrace Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 05 /
NOONAN, David Paul 150 Shoreline Drive Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/10] |
Former [2020/07] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18780953.8 | 26.03.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018US24292 | Priority number, date | US201762483279P | 07.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762483279 P | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018187069 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606400 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3606400 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B5/00, A61B8/00, A61B10/02, A61B34/00, A61B34/20, A61B34/30, // A61B90/11, A61B17/34 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
A61B90/11 (EP,US);
A61B34/30 (EP,KR,US);
A61B34/20 (US);
A61B17/3423 (EP);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/00809 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/00876 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2034/2055 (US);
A61B2034/2063 (US);
A61B2034/2065 (US);
A61B2034/301 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2034/303 (US);
A61B2090/0808 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2090/3937 (US);
A61B2090/571 (EP,US);
A61B46/10 (EP);
A61B90/13 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/07] | A61B1/00, A61B5/00, A61B8/00, A61B10/02, A61B34/00, A61B34/20, A61B34/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSRICHTUNG EINER PATIENTENEINFÜHRVORRICHTUNG | [2020/07] | English: | PATIENT INTRODUCER ALIGNMENT | [2020/07] | French: | ALIGNEMENT D'INTRODUCTEUR POUR PATIENT | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 25.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22160897.9 / EP4032459 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2018 | AL | 09.03.2022 | AT | 09.03.2022 | CY | 09.03.2022 | CZ | 09.03.2022 | DK | 09.03.2022 | EE | 09.03.2022 | ES | 09.03.2022 | FI | 09.03.2022 | HR | 09.03.2022 | IT | 09.03.2022 | LT | 09.03.2022 | LV | 09.03.2022 | MC | 09.03.2022 | MK | 09.03.2022 | NL | 09.03.2022 | PL | 09.03.2022 | RO | 09.03.2022 | RS | 09.03.2022 | SE | 09.03.2022 | SI | 09.03.2022 | SK | 09.03.2022 | SM | 09.03.2022 | IE | 26.03.2022 | LU | 26.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | BG | 09.06.2022 | NO | 09.06.2022 | GR | 10.06.2022 | IS | 09.07.2022 | PT | 11.07.2022 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
MK | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
IE | 26.03.2022 | ||
LU | 26.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
IE | 26.03.2022 | ||
LU | 26.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
IE | 26.03.2022 | ||
LU | 26.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
IE | 26.03.2022 | ||
LU | 26.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
IE | 26.03.2022 | ||
LU | 26.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
IE | 26.03.2022 | ||
LU | 26.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.03.2022 | |
NO | 09.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011071541 (PRISCO GIUSEPPE MARIA [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0091]; figures 10, 10a *; | [A]WO2016137612 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0025]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2017084027 (MINTZ DAVID S [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract * | International search | [A]US2009270760 (LEIMBACH JESSICA P [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * entire document *; | [A]US2010204646 (PLICCHI GIANNI [IT], et al) [A] 1-30 * entire document *; | [A]US2016199984 (LOHMEIER SEBASTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-30 * entire document *; | [PA]WO2017114855 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [PA] 1-30* entire document *; | [PA]US2017319289 (NEFF THOMAS [DE]) [PA] 1-30 * entire document * | by applicant | US2011071541 |