EP3531498 - HEAT DISSIPATING STRUCTURE OF CYLINDRICAL BATTERY CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2024/27] |
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | ||
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2019/35] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jae Sang LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
YANG, Kun Joo LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
YOON, Seog Jin LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/27] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2019/35] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18781246.6 | 08.02.2018 | [2019/35] | WO2018KR01705 | Priority number, date | KR20170043028 | 03.04.2017 Original published format: KR 20170043028 | [2019/35] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018186579 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3531498 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3531498 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/643, H01M10/6554, H01M10/653, H01M10/613, H01M10/625, H01M10/6235, H01M10/6551, G01R31/36, H01M50/569 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
H01M10/613 (EP,KR);
H01M10/643 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6551 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/36 (EP);
G01R31/382 (KR,US);
G01R31/396 (KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (KR);
H01M10/44 (KR,US);
H01M10/6235 (EP);
H01M10/625 (EP);
H01M10/653 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6554 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/569 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/20 (EP);
H01M2220/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/08] | H01M10/643, H01M10/6554, H01M10/653, H01M10/613, H01M2/20, H01M10/625, H01M10/6235, H01M10/6551, G01R31/36 | ||
Former IPC [2019/35] | H01M10/643, H01M10/6551, H01M10/6554, H01M10/653, H01M10/44, H01M10/613, H01M10/0525, G01R31/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEABLEITENDE STRUKTUR EINER ZYLINDRISCHEN BATTERIEZELLE | [2019/35] | English: | HEAT DISSIPATING STRUCTURE OF CYLINDRICAL BATTERY CELL | [2019/35] | French: | STRUCTURE DE DISSIPATION THERMIQUE D'ÉLÉMENT DE BATTERIE CYLINDRIQUE | [2019/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2019 | Translation filed | 21.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 26.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102008034695 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [A]KR20110084959 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US2012034499 (MEEHAN HENRY M [US]); | [A]WO2015169820 (TECH AG H [LI]) | International search | [A]KR20020093827 ; | [A]KR100667943B ; | [A]US2009068555 (FUKUOKA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]KR20110084959 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]KR20140142770 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | Examination | CN105977423 |