EP3608455 - POROUS FIBER AND ADSORPTION COLUMN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Aishan c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
FUJIEDA, Hiroaki c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
UENO, Yoshiyuki c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18781532.9 | 23.03.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018JP11722 | Priority number, date | JP20170074185 | 04.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017074185 | [2020/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018186210 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608455 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3608455 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/34, A61M1/36, B01J20/20, B01J20/26, B01J20/28 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
D01D5/247 (EP,KR);
D01F6/52 (EP,KR);
B01J20/285 (US);
A61M1/1621 (KR,US);
A61M1/3486 (EP,KR);
A61M1/3679 (EP,KR);
B01D15/00 (KR);
B01D15/1871 (US);
B01J20/0207 (US);
B01J20/0277 (US);
B01J20/06 (US);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/205 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/261 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/28004 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/28021 (EP,KR);
B01J20/28023 (EP,KR);
B01J20/28026 (US);
B01J20/28028 (EP,KR);
B01J20/28052 (US);
B01J20/28057 (EP,KR);
B01J20/28059 (US);
B01J20/28078 (EP,KR);
B01J20/2808 (US);
B01J20/28083 (US);
B01J20/28085 (US);
B01J20/28092 (EP,KR);
B01J20/3085 (EP,KR);
B01J20/3092 (EP,KR);
B01J20/3293 (EP);
B01J20/3295 (EP,KR);
C01G23/047 (KR);
D01D5/34 (KR);
D01F1/10 (KR,US);
D01F6/00 (EP);
D01F6/16 (US);
D01F8/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2220/46 (US);
D10B2401/10 (US);
D10B2509/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/48] | D01F6/00, A61M1/36, B01D15/00, B01J20/20, B01J20/28, C01G23/047, D01F6/52, D01F8/10, D01D5/247 | ||
Former IPC [2020/07] | D01F6/00, A61M1/36, B01D15/00, B01J20/20, B01J20/28, C01G23/047, D01F6/52, D01F8/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORÖSE FASER UND ADSORPTIONSSÄULE | [2020/07] | English: | POROUS FIBER AND ADSORPTION COLUMN | [2020/07] | French: | FIBRE POREUSE ET COLONNE D'ADSORPTION | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2019 | Translation filed | 26.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 29.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
LV | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
PL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005133250 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [XI]US2008053891 (KOOPS GEERT-HENDRIK [NL], et al); | [A]JP2017029712 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) | International search | [XA]JPH03260170 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPH0693516 (KURARAY CO); | [A]JP2007046178 (JAPAN EXLAN CO LTD); | [XA]JP2008510083 | by applicant | JP2010227757 | JP2014189937 |