EP3608116 - MARKING SYSTEM AND MARKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI Shunsuke c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
AIDA Kohhei c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
KAWASAKI Masahiro c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 04 /
TOKUDA Yuya c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18781626.9 | 06.03.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018JP08584 | Priority number, date | JP20170075029 | 05.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017075029 | [2020/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018186094 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608116 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3608116 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B41J25/20, B41M5/00, B41M5/28, G06K7/10, G06K7/14, G06K19/06 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
G06K19/06028 (EP,US);
G01D7/005 (US);
B41J3/01 (EP);
B41J3/407 (EP);
B41M5/28 (US);
G06K19/06037 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MARKIERUNGSSYSTEM UND MARKIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/07] | English: | MARKING SYSTEM AND MARKING DEVICE | [2020/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MARQUAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE MARQUAGE | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2019 | Translation filed | 05.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 03.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004341273 (LINTEC CORP) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0015] ** figure - * | International search | [Y]JP2001348568 (TOSHIBA TEC KK) [Y] 8-9 * , paragraphs [0045], [0050], [0059] & US 2002/0026002 A1, paragraphs [0045], [0052], [0058] *; | [YA]JP3086000U (ISHIKAWA, Hiroko) [Y] 1-2, 5-10 * , paragraphs [0010]-[0017] (Family: none) * [A] 3-4; | [Y]JP2002310809 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 8-9 * , paragraphs [0017]-[0030] (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2004142758 (SATO KK) [Y] 1-2, 5-10 * , paragraph [0010] (Family: none) * [A] 3-4; | [YA]JP2006150735 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [Y] 1-2, 5-10 * , paragraphs [0039]-[0065], [0134] (Family: none) * [A] 3-4; | [A]US2013340885 (CLAYTON TERRILL SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-10* , entire text, all drawings & WO 2013/192549 A1 & EP 2864740 A1 * | by applicant | JP20100526386 |