EP3729056 - TRANSMITTED LIGHT INSPECTION APPARATUS AND TRANSMITTED LIGHT INSPECTION METHOD FOR SIDEWALL INSPECTION OF CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/44] | LIGHT TRANSMISSION INSPECTION DEVICE AND LIGHT TRANSMISSION INSPECTION METHOD FOR THE SIDE-WALL INSPECTION OF CONTAINERS | ||
[2024/11] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWIRANDT, Rainer Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18781994.1 | 25.09.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018EP75849 | Priority number, date | DE201710223347 | 20.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017223347 | [2020/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019120654 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3729056 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3729056 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/21, G01N21/90, G01B11/24, G01M11/00, // G01N21/88 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
G01N21/21 (EP);
B07C5/3408 (EP);
G01N21/8806 (EP);
G01N21/90 (EP);
G01N2021/216 (EP);
G01N2021/845 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | G01N21/21, G01N21/90, G01N21/88, B07C5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHLICHTINSPEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND DURCHLICHTINSPEKTIONSVERFAHREN ZUR SEITENWANDINSPEKTION VON BEHÄLTERN | [2020/44] | English: | TRANSMITTED LIGHT INSPECTION APPARATUS AND TRANSMITTED LIGHT INSPECTION METHOD FOR SIDEWALL INSPECTION OF CONTAINERS | [2024/11] | French: | APPAREIL D'INSPECTION A LUMIÈRE TRANSMISE ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSPECTION A LUMIÈRE TRANSMISE POUR L'INSPECTION DES PAROIS LATÉRALES DE RÉCIPIENTS | [2024/11] |
Former [2020/44] | LIGHT TRANSMISSION INSPECTION DEVICE AND LIGHT TRANSMISSION INSPECTION METHOD FOR THE SIDE-WALL INSPECTION OF CONTAINERS | ||
Former [2020/44] | DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION EN LUMIÈRE TRANSMISE ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSPECTION EN LUMIÈRE TRANSMISE POUR L'INSPECTION DE PAROIS LATÉRALES DE RÉCIPIENTS | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 31.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0926486 (OWENS BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER [US]); | [Y]EP1176416 (SUNTORY LTD [JP]); | [Y]US7379177 (SONES RICHARD A [US], et al); | [AD]DE202013100834U (KRONES AG [DE]) | Examination | DE202013100834U | by applicant | DE202013100834U |