EP3852566 - WELDING HELMET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2024/03] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SERNFÄLT, Mats U. Bollstanäsvägen 3 S-191 89 Sollentuna / SE | 02 /
DANIELS, Björn Bollstanäsvägen 3 S-191 89 Sollentuna / SE | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2024/03] |
Former [2021/30] | Vollmers, Hans-Gerd 3M Deutschland GmbH 3M Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Straße 1 41453 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 18782208.5 | 19.09.2018 | [2021/30] | WO2018IB57230 | Priority number, date | EP20170192508 | 22.09.2017 Original published format: EP 17192508 | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019058287 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3852566 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3852566 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/22, A61F9/06 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
A42B3/225 (EP,US);
A42B3/222 (US);
A61F9/045 (US);
A61F9/06 (EP,US);
A61F9/064 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWEISSHELM | [2021/30] | English: | WELDING HELMET | [2021/30] | French: | CASQUE DE SOUDAGE | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2020 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 21.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2024 | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2153003 (SAFETY PRODUCTS LIMITED) [A] 1* page 2, lines 46-89; figure 2 *; | [X]JPH07216622 (KOKEN KK) [X] 1-4,7,10 * abstract *; | [XI]US6298498 (BURNS JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-14 * column 5, lines 23-54; figures 6,7 * [I] 9; | [X]US8336114 (LEE SHIH-MIN [TW]) [X] 1-3,10,13,14 * column 3, lines 36-48; figure 2 * * column 4, lines 31-60 * |