EP3691911 - OPTICALLY VARIABLE SEE-THROUGH SECURITY ELEMENT AND DATA CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 161 81677 München / DE | [2023/10] |
Former [2020/33] | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEUFEL, Björn Wiesseer Straße 10 83700 Weißach / DE | 02 /
SCHERER, Kai Hermann An der Wies 19 82491 Grainau / DE | 03 /
HOFFMÜLLER, Winfried Marktstrasse 75 83646 Bad Tölz / DE | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | Giesecke + Devrient IP Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18782305.9 | 27.09.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018EP00456 | Priority number, date | DE20171009226 | 04.10.2017 Original published format: DE102017009226 | [2020/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019068362 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3691911 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3691911 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/324, B42D25/351, B42D25/328 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
B42D25/324 (EP);
B42D25/328 (EP);
B42D25/351 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCH VARIABLES DURCHSICHTSSICHERHEITSELEMENT UND DATENTRÄGER | [2020/33] | English: | OPTICALLY VARIABLE SEE-THROUGH SECURITY ELEMENT AND DATA CARRIER | [2020/33] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE SÉCURITÉ TRANSPARENT OPTIQUEMENT VARIABLE ET SUPPORT DE DONNÉES | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 04.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2022
22.08.2022
ADMISSIBLE Hueck Folien Gesellschaft m.b.H. Gewerbepark 30 4342 Baumgartenberg / AT Opponent's representative Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2022/39] |
Former [2022/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2022
Hueck Folien Gesellschaft m.b.H. Gewerbepark 30 4342 Baumgartenberg / AT Opponent's representative Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | 07.09.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.12.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/21] | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2018 | AL | 24.11.2021 | CY | 24.11.2021 | CZ | 24.11.2021 | DK | 24.11.2021 | EE | 24.11.2021 | ES | 24.11.2021 | FI | 24.11.2021 | HR | 24.11.2021 | LT | 24.11.2021 | LV | 24.11.2021 | MC | 24.11.2021 | MK | 24.11.2021 | MT | 24.11.2021 | NL | 24.11.2021 | PL | 24.11.2021 | RO | 24.11.2021 | RS | 24.11.2021 | SE | 24.11.2021 | SI | 24.11.2021 | SK | 24.11.2021 | SM | 24.11.2021 | TR | 24.11.2021 | BG | 24.02.2022 | NO | 24.02.2022 | GR | 25.02.2022 | IS | 24.03.2022 | PT | 24.03.2022 | IE | 27.09.2022 | LU | 27.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.09.2018 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
MK | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
TR | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 27.09.2018 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
MK | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 27.09.2018 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 24.11.2021 | |
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 24.11.2021 | |
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 24.11.2021 | |
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 24.11.2021 | |
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | FI | 24.11.2021 | |
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 24.11.2021 | |
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 24.11.2021 | |
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 24.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006018171 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 19, line 6 - page 20, line 28; figures 13,14 *; | [A]GB2474903 (RUE DE INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE102009056934 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]DE102009058243 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]DE102012105571 (OVD KINEGRAM AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE102014019088 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0041] - [0087]; figure - *; | [A]DE102015010744 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0032] - [0097]; figure - * | by applicant | WO2011064162 | WO2011066991 | WO2011066990 | WO2011082761 | EP1966769 | WO2016096094 | Opposition | WO2006069663 | EP2219168 | WO2011082761 | EP1966769 | WO2016096094 |