EP3675730 - SENSING SYSTEM FOR RESPIRATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBB, Richard C. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
VINER, Andrew S. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
AMELL, Nicholas G. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
BONIFAS, Andrew P. 5429 Allbright Square Edmonton, Alberta T6W 3H7 / CA | 05 /
RAKOW, Neal A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | Mathys & Squire Mathys & Squire Europe LLP Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18783092.2 | 28.08.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018IB56560 | Priority number, date | US201762553569P | 01.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762553569 P | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019043581 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3675730 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/08, A61B5/097, A61B5/00, G01N27/04, G01N27/12 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
A61B5/0813 (EP);
A61B5/082 (EP,US);
A61B5/0015 (EP);
A61B5/0017 (EP,US);
A61B5/002 (US);
A61B5/097 (EP,US);
G01N27/12 (EP);
G01N27/122 (US);
G01N33/497 (US);
A61B2560/0462 (EP);
A61B2562/0209 (EP);
A61B2562/0217 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | SENSORSYSTEM FÜR ATEMSCHUTZGERÄT | [2020/28] | English: | SENSING SYSTEM FOR RESPIRATOR | [2020/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION POUR RESPIRATEUR | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 05.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US6612306 (MAULT JAMES R [US]) [X] 1-4,9-17,20,29 * abstract * * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 65 * * column 6, line 60 - column 8, line 17 * * column 13, lines 22-53 * [A] 6,18,19,21,22 [I] 5,7,8,23-28; | [XAI]US2003208133 (MAULT JAMES R [US]) [X] 1-4,10-17,29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0066] - [0074] * [A] 6,18,19,21,22 [I] 5,7-9,20,23-28; | [XA]WO2016065180 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [X] 1,29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0128] - [0164] *[A] 2-28; | [XI]US2017122931 (CARNAHAN DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-17,20,23-29 * abstract * [I] 7,18,19,21,22 | by applicant | US5936703 | WO2016044082 | - COMPERNOLLE, S.; MULLER, J.-F., Atmos. Chem. Phys., (20140000), vol. 14, pages 12815 - 12837 |