EP3685521 - TRANSMISSION OF GROUP COMMON CONTROL INFORMATION IN NEW RADIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAM, Wooseok 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
LUO, Tao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
AKKARAKARAN, Sony 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
JOHN WILSON, Makesh, Pravin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
NAGARAJA, Sumeeth 4441 Calle Mar de Armonia San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 06 /
WANG, Xiao, Feng 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 07 /
CHEN, Shengbo 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/31] | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18783227.4 | 18.09.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018US51554 | Priority number, date | US201762560617P | 19.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762560617 P | US201816133582 | 17.09.2018 Original published format: US201816133582 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019060312 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3685521 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04L5/00, H04W72/04 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04L5/005 (US);
H04B7/0408 (EP,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/0069 (US);
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W72/51 (US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
H04W72/046 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG VON GEMEINSAMEN GRUPPENSTEUERINFORMATIONEN IN NEW RADIO | [2020/31] | English: | TRANSMISSION OF GROUP COMMON CONTROL INFORMATION IN NEW RADIO | [2020/31] | French: | TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE COMMUNES DE GROUPE DANS UNE NOUVELLE RADIO | [2020/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 14.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016095003 (YU CHIA-HAO [TW], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 8-12 *; | [XI] - SAMSUNG, "Multibeam Transmission for PDCCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czechia; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1713614 MULTIBEAM TRANSMISSION FOR PDCCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051316414 [X] 1-3,5,7,9-11,13,15 * the whole document * [I] 4,6,8,12,14,16-30 | [XI] - NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS, "Discussion on Robust Beam Management", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1708271 DISCUSSION ON ROBUST BEAM MANAGEMENT_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRAN, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170514), XP051273464 [X] 1-3,9-11 * the whole document * [I] 4-8,12-30 | [A] - SAMSUNG, "On Beam Indication", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czechia; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1713595-DL_BEAM_INDICATION_V1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051316395 [A] 1-30 * sections 2-6 * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Downlink Beam Management in NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1705732 DOWNLINK BEAM MANAGEMENT IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170514), XP051276033 [A] 1-30 * sections 1, 2, 4 * | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Contents of group-common PDCCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170617), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1709953, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1706/Docs/, (20170617), XP051304693 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * |