EP3654924 - DENTAL COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND MILL BLANKS CONSISTING OF SAID COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kulzer GmbH Leipziger Strasse 2 63450 Hanau / DE | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UTTERODT, Andreas Backhausgasse 11 61267 Neu-Anspach / DE | 02 /
REISCHL, Kurt Schulstr. 67 35799 Merenberg / DE | 03 /
SCHÖNHOF, Nelli Hoher Rain 4 35619 Braunfels / DE | 04 /
ECK, Michael Untergasse 8 61389 Schmitten / DE | 05 /
KOCOGLU, Raif Frankfurterstr. 7 61279 Grävenwiesbach / DE | 06 /
SCHNEIDER, Jutta Kastanienweg 1 65594 Runkel / DE | 07 /
KEMPKA, Caroline Schottener Str. 2 61200 Wölfersheim / DE | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Bendele, Tanja RUHR-IP Patentanwälte Wolfsbachweg 29 45133 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/22] | Bendele, Tanja RUHR-IP Patentanwälte Brucker Holt 58 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 18783399.1 | 01.10.2018 | [2020/22] | WO2018EP76590 | Priority number, date | DE201710123006 | 04.10.2017 Original published format: DE102017123006 | [2020/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019068611 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3654924 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083, A61K6/00 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
A61K6/77 (EP);
A61C13/09 (US);
A61C13/087 (US);
A61C5/77 (US);
A61K6/818 (US);
A61K6/836 (US);
A61K6/887 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L75/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Title | German: | DENTALES KOMPOSITMATERIAL SOWIE FRÄSROHLINGE DIESES KOMPOSITMATERIALS | [2020/22] | English: | DENTAL COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND MILL BLANKS CONSISTING OF SAID COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2020/22] | French: | MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE DENTAIRE ET ÉBAUCHES À FRAISER DE CE MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 21.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/03] | 09.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0254185 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-11,13-15 * claims 1-15 * * page 15, line 20 - line 33 * * page 16, line 9 - line 51 * * page 21; table 1 *; | [X]EP2016931 (HERAEUS KULZER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11,13-15 * page 4, paragraph 27 *; | [A]US2010076115 (UTTERODT ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-11,13-15 * claims 1-3 * * page 4; table I *; | [X]EP2436365 (VOCO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11,13-15 * page 46 - page 47; example 9; table 2 * * claims 1-15 * * page 8, paragraph 34 *; | [A]EP2644183 (HERAEUS KULZER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11,13-15 * page 5, paragraph 32 * * claims 1-15 *; | [A] - JEONG-KIL PARK ET AL, "Polymerization shrinkage, flexural and compression properties of low-shrinkage dental resin composites", DENTAL MATERIALS JOURNAL, JP, (20140101), vol. 33, no. 1, doi:10.4012/dmj.2013-126, ISSN 0287-4547, pages 104 - 110, XP055546124 [A] 1-11,13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4012/dmj.2013-126 | [A] - IZABELA BARSZCZEWSKA-RYBAREK ET AL, "Comparative Study of Structure-Property Relationships in Polymer Networks Based on Bis-GMA, TEGDMA and Various Urethane-Dimethacrylates", MATERIALS, CH, (20150319), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:10.3390/ma8031230, ISSN 1996-1944, pages 1230 - 1248, XP055562992 [A] 1-11,13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ma8031230 | by applicant | - WATTS et al., Bonded-DiscMethode - Dental Materials, (20040000), vol. 20, pages 88 - 95 | - Wasser analog Dent. Mater. J., (20140000), vol. 33, no. 5, pages 705 - 710 | - Dent. Materials J, (20140000), vol. 33, no. 4/5, pages 705 - 710 | - DWAYNE D. AROLA et al., Biomaterials, (20060000), vol. 27, pages 2131 - 2140 | - Dent. Mater. J., (20140000), vol. 33, no. 5, pages 705 - 710 |