EP3610326 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A RELIEF IMAGE FROM A LIQUID PHOTOPOLYMER RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Macdermid Graphics Solutions, LLC 245 Freight Street Waterbury, CT 06702 / US | [2023/22] |
Former [2020/08] | For all designated states Macdermid Graphics Solutions, LLC 245 Freight Street Waterbury, CT 06702 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RECCHIA, David A. 2166 Goodwood Boulevard Smyrna, GA 30080 / US | 02 /
VEST, Ryan W. 9021 West Daventry Road Mequon, WI 53097 / US | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [2023/22] |
Former [2020/08] | Page White & Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 18783865.1 | 02.04.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018US25663 | Priority number, date | US201715484314 | 11.04.2017 Original published format: US201715484314 | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018191049 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3610326 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3610326 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/004, G03F7/11, G03F7/115, G03F7/16, G03F7/20, G03F7/26, G03F7/30, B41N1/06, B22C9/06, B29C33/38, B29C35/08, G03F7/00, // B29K105/24, B29L31/00 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
B22C9/06 (EP,US);
B29C33/3842 (EP,US);
B29C35/0894 (EP,US);
G03F7/0017 (EP,US);
G03F7/11 (EP);
G03F7/2012 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0833 (EP,US);
B29K2105/24 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | G03F7/004, G03F7/11, G03F7/115, G03F7/16, G03F7/20, G03F7/26, G03F7/30, B41N1/06, B22C9/06, B29C33/38, B29C35/08, // B29K105/24, B29L31/00 | ||
Former IPC [2020/08] | G03F7/004, G03F7/11, G03F7/115, G03F7/16, G03F7/20, G03F7/26, G03F7/30, B41N1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RELIEFBILDES AUF EINEM FLÜSSIGEN PHOTOPOLYMERHARZ | [2020/08] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A RELIEF IMAGE FROM A LIQUID PHOTOPOLYMER RESIN | [2020/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE IMAGE EN RELIEF À PARTIR D'UNE RÉSINE PHOTOPOLYMÈRE LIQUIDE | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 13.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5275919 (KAWATSUJI SHINICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 8 - line 38 * * column 5; example 1 ** figure 4 *; | [A]US2008107908 (LONG DONALD [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0069] * * figure 1 *; | [I]US2011300398 (VEST RYAN [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0061] * * claim - * * figure - * | International search | [Y]US2008107908 (LONG DONALD [US], et al) [Y] 1-9, 12-18 * ; figure 1; paragraphs [0038]-[0040], [0044], [0058]-[0059], [0062], [0066]-[0068], [0073], [0077], [0080]; claim 15 *; | [Y]JP2011053424 (MISATO MIRAI 21 KK) [Y] 1-9, 12-18* ; see machine translation; page 6, first and third paragraphs; figures 2C-2D, 2F *; | [Y]US8476000 (VEST RYAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-9, 12-18 * ; column 1, lines 51-55; column 3, lines 25-32, 39-49; column 5, lines 10-16; column 6, lines 1-19, 40-52, 57-67; column 7, lines 65-67; column 8, lines 5-17 * |