EP3697641 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING ENERGY TO A MOBILE PART CONFIGURED AS A VEHICLE, COMPRISING AN ENERGY STORE AND A SECONDARY WINDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/35] | CHARGING DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING ENERGY TO A MOBILE PART, COMPRISING AN ENERGY STORE AND A SECONDARY WINDING | ||
[2023/19] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Str. 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, Olaf Obere Mühlstrasse 39 76646 Bruchsal - Untergrombach / DE | 02 /
BÖCKLE, Jürgen Schlossbergring 52 76646 Bruchsal / DE | 03 /
SCHILLING, Rainer Falkenweg 9 76703 Kraichtal / DE | 04 /
MAHLEIN, Jochen Ruschgraben 45 76139 Karlsruhe / DE | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 18785510.1 | 08.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018EP25261 | Priority number, date | DE20171009676 | 18.10.2017 Original published format: DE102017009676 | [2020/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019076483 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3697641 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3697641 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/31, B60L53/34 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
B60L53/12 (EP,US);
B60L53/14 (EP);
B60L53/16 (EP);
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J2207/40 (EP);
H02J2310/48 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNG AN EIN ALS FAHRZEUG AUSGEFÜHRTES MOBILTEIL MIT ENERGIESPEICHER UND SEKUNDÄRWICKLUNG | [2023/19] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING ENERGY TO A MOBILE PART CONFIGURED AS A VEHICLE, COMPRISING AN ENERGY STORE AND A SECONDARY WINDING | [2023/19] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE VERS UNE UNITÉ MOBILE CONFIGURÉ EN TANT QUE VÉHICULE ET AYANT UN ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE ET UN ENROULEMENT SECONDAIRE | [2023/19] |
Former [2020/35] | LADEGERÄT UND SYSTEM ZUR ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNG AN EIN MOBILTEIL MIT ENERGIESPEICHER UND SEKUNDÄRWICKLUNG | ||
Former [2020/35] | CHARGING DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING ENERGY TO A MOBILE PART, COMPRISING AN ENERGY STORE AND A SECONDARY WINDING | ||
Former [2020/35] | CHARGEUR ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE VERS UNE UNITÉ MOBILE AYANT UN ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE ET UN ENROULEMENT SECONDAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 18.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102010022727 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]EP2983267 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,15 * paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0080] * [I] 2-14; | [A]US2016264007 (HAASE MICAH [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI] - Samsung Deutschland, "Samsung Galaxy S7 / S7 edge: Induktive Schnellladestation", Youtube, (20160414), page 1, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=fua_3NRjUNQ, (20190115), XP054979019 [X] 1-4,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 9 | Examination | EP2774800 | by applicant | DE102011003543 | DE202011110435U | DE102013200102 | DE102013220704 | DE202014000328U | DE102014207719 | DE102014223931 | DE102014222475 | DE102015204070 | DE102016203172 |