EP3474951 - ALIPHATIC ANIONIC COMPOUNDS AND OXIDATIVE COMPOUNDS WITH IMPROVED STABILITY AND EFFICACY FOR USE IN PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micropure, Inc. 16100 N. Greenway-Hayden Loop, F-400 Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEWALE, Jaiprakash, G. 16100 N. Greenway-Hayden Loop F-400 Scottsdale AZ 85260 / US | 02 /
COOLEY, William, E. 16100 N. Greenway-Hayden Loop F-400 Scottsdale AZ 85260 / US | 03 /
RATCLIFF, James, L. 16100 N. Greenway-Hayden Loop F-400 Scottsdale AZ 85260 / US | 04 /
GARCIA-SMITH, Esmeralda, Ann 16100 N. Greenway-Hayden Loop F-400 Scottsdale AZ 85260 / US | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18785801.4 | 03.09.2018 | [2019/18] | WO2018US49302 | Priority number, date | US201762553450P | 01.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762553450 P | US201862676170P | 24.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862676170 P | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019046841 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3474951 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q11/00, A61K8/37, A61K33/20, A61K8/20, A61K8/24, A61K8/44, A61P1/02, A61P15/02, A61P17/02, A61Q17/00, A61Q19/00 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/442 (US);
A61K33/20 (EP);
A61K8/20 (EP,US);
A61K8/21 (US);
A61K8/24 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P15/02 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61Q17/005 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/18] | A61Q11/00, A61K8/37, A61K33/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Title | German: | ALIPHATISCHE ANIONISCHE VERBINDUNGEN UND OXIDATIVE VERBINDUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTER STABILITÄT UND WIRKSAMKEIT ZUR VERWENDUNG IN PHARMAZEUTISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2019/18] | English: | ALIPHATIC ANIONIC COMPOUNDS AND OXIDATIVE COMPOUNDS WITH IMPROVED STABILITY AND EFFICACY FOR USE IN PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS | [2019/18] | French: | COMPOSÉS ANIONIQUES ALIPHATIQUES ET COMPOSÉS OXYDANTS DE STABILITÉ ET D'EFFICACITÉ AMÉLIORÉES POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS DES COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2019/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 04.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2011318282 (RATCLIFF JAMES L [US], et al) [I] 14 * claims 1,2,4,9,11 * * example *[A] 1-13,15 | International search | [Y]US2008247973 (BAIG ARIF ALI [US], et al) [Y] 25-28 * para [0065], [0098] *; | [Y]US2010221198 (RATCLIFF JAMES L [US], et al) [Y] 12, 20-21 , 29-30 * para [0029], [0070], Table 1 *; | [Y]US2010233101 (GROOTVELD MARTIN C [GB], et al) [Y] 7-9, 23 * para [0043], [0045], [0067]-[0069] *; | [A]US2012034280 (COHEN MARVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * Entire Document *; | [XY]WO2012051727 (SWISSDENT COSMETICS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-6, 10-11, 13-19, 22, 24 * pg 9, In 30 to pg 10, In 2; pg 14, In 24-29; pg 43, In 6 to pg 45, In 4 * [Y] 7-9, 12, 20-21, 23, 25-30; | [A]US2012164084 (RATCLIFF JAMES L [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * Entire Document *; | [A]US8906348 (NARASIMHAN SAROJA [US], et al) [A] 1-30* Entire Document * |