EP3672954 - COMPOUNDS, SALTS THEREOF AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACADIA Pharmaceuticals Inc. 12830 El Camino Real, Suite 400 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2020/41] |
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc. 3611 Valley Centre Drive, Suite 300 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURSTEIN, Ethan, S. 4168 Sturgeon Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
OLSSON, Roger Klagshamnsvagen 99A SE-218 38 Bunkeflostrand / SE | 03 /
BORGSTRÖM, Björn, Gustav Uardavägen 52B LGH 1101 SE-224 71 Lund / SE | 04 /
JANSSON, Karl, Erik Spannmålsvägen 11 SE-247 55 Dalby / SE | 05 /
SKÖLD, Niklas, Patrik Grisslevägen 3 SE-227 32 Lund / SE | 06 /
VON WACHENFELDT, Henrik Skanörsgatan 3B SE-214 38 Malmö / SE | 07 /
WAHLSTRÖM, Larisa, Yudina Västerlånggatan 50B SE-241 31 Eslöv / SE | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/27] | 01 /
BURSTEIN, Ethan, S. 4168 Sturgeon Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | ||
02 /
OLSSON, Roger Klagshamnsvagen 99A SE-218 38 Bunkeflostrand / SE | |||
03 /
BORGSTRÖM, Björn, Gustav Uardavägen 52B LGH 1101 SE-224 71 Lund / SE | |||
04 /
JANSSON, Karl, Erik Spannmålsvägen 11 SE-247 55 Dalby / SE | |||
05 /
SKÖLD, Niklas, Patrik Grisslevägen 3 SE-227 32 Lund / SE | |||
06 /
VON WACHENFELDT, Henrik Hässleholmsgatan 2B SE-214 43 Malmö / SE | |||
07 /
WAHLSTRÖM, Larisa, Yudina Västerlånggatan 50B SE-241 31 Eslöv / SE | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/27] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18786069.7 | 20.08.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018US00354 | Priority number, date | US201762548301P | 21.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762548301 P | SE20170030225 | 24.08.2017 Original published format: SE 1730225 | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019040107 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672954 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D417/12, C07D451/04, C07D211/58, A61K31/45, A61K31/4525, A61K31/453, A61K31/4535, A61K31/454, A61K31/4545, A61K31/46, A61P25/00 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
C07D211/58 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D413/12 (CN,US);
A61K31/4468 (KR);
A61K31/4525 (KR);
A61P25/00 (CN,KR);
C07D401/12 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D405/12 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN, SALZE DAVON UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN | [2020/27] | English: | COMPOUNDS, SALTS THEREOF AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF DISEASES | [2020/27] | French: | COMPOSÉS, SELS CORRESPONDANTS ET MÉTHODES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 19.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006036874 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13,16,17,20-28,32-38,43,44,47,48 * paragraph [0002]; claim - *; | [X]US2007260064 (TOLF BO-RAGNAR [SE], et al) [X] 1-9,13,16,17,20-28,32-38 * paragraph [0005]; example - *; | [X]US2008280886 (GANT THOMAS G [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13,16,17,20-28,32-38,43,44,47,48* paragraph [0002]; example - *; | [X]WO2009039461 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13,16,17,20-28,32-38,43,44,47,48 * paragraph [0002]; claim - *; | [X]WO2010111353 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13,16,17,20-28,32-38,43,44,47,48 * paragraph [0002]; example -; claim - * | by applicant | US5707798 | - MOULIGNIER, Rev. Neurol., (19940000), vol. 150, pages 3 - 15 | - BOULLIN, Serotonin In Mental Abnormalities, (19780000), vol. 1, page 316 | - GERSHON et al., The Peripheral Actions of 5-Hydroxytryptamine, (19890000), vol. 246 | - SAXENA et al., J. Cardiovascular Pharmacol., (19900000), vol. 15, no. 7 | - MELTZER, Neuropsychopharmacology, (19990000), vol. 21, pages 106S - 115S | - BARNES; SHARP, Neuropharmacology, (19990000), vol. 38, pages 1083 - 1152 | - GLENNON, Neurosci. Biobehavioral Rev., (19900000), vol. 14, page 35 | - Biochem., (19720000), vol. 11, pages 942 - 944 | - NOGRADY, Medicinal Chemistry A Biochemical Approach, Oxford University Press, (19850000), pages 388 - 392 | - Chem. Abstr., (19980000), vol. 128, page 111548 | - SALTZMAN, Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm., (19910000), vol. 181, page 1469 | - CHENG; PRUSSOFF, Biochem Pharmacol., (19731201), vol. 22, no. 23, page 3099108 |