EP3688844 - CONTACT WITH A PRESS-FIT FASTENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interplex Industries, Inc. 231 Ferris Avenue East Providence, RI 02916 / US | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARRISH, Jeffrey, D. 405 Sunset Street Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18786137.2 | 24.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018US52385 | Priority number, date | US201762564573P | 28.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762564573 P | US201862614640P | 08.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862614640 P | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019067347 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3688844 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3688844 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/58 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
H01R12/585 (EP,US);
H01R12/523 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTAKT MIT AUFPRESSVERSCHLUSS | [2020/32] | English: | CONTACT WITH A PRESS-FIT FASTENER | [2020/32] | French: | CONTACT POURVU D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE FIXATION À AJUSTEMENT PAR PRESSION | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 15.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | IT | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0092150 (BUCKBEE MEARS CO [US]) [Y] 17 * figure 1 *; | [YA]US4867710 (HARTING DIETMAR [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * figure 3 * [A] 1; | [A]DE19810897 (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [A] 1-20* column 4; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2004029408 (BROWN JOHN B [US]) [Y] 19 * figure 3 *; | [XYI]US2009104823 (LUDWIG RONNY [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 4,10,12-15,17-19 [I] 16,20; | [Y]DE102009060739 (SORIG LUDGER [DE]) [Y] 10,12-15 * figure 5 *; | [Y]CN103730742 (GUANGZHOU HUALING REFRIGERATION EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [Y] 18 * figure 1 * |