EP3714097 - CONTROLLING THE TREATMENT OF FIBROUS MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Straße 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIM, Martin Obere Breite Str. 31 88212 Ravensburg / DE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 18786284.2 | 11.10.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018EP77700 | Priority number, date | DE201710127771 | 24.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017127771 | [2020/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019101425 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714097 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3714097 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | D21D1/00, D21D1/20, D21D1/30, D21G9/00 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
D21D1/30 (EP);
D21D1/002 (EP);
D21D1/20 (EP);
D21G9/0018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG DER FASERSTOFFBEHANDLUNG | [2020/40] | English: | CONTROLLING THE TREATMENT OF FIBROUS MATERIAL | [2020/40] | French: | COMMANDE DU TRAITEMENT D'UNE MATIÈRE FIBREUSE | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 24.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0406225 (KAMYR AB [SE]); | [X]WO0043590 (J & L FIBER SERVICES INC [US]); | [A]CA2300737 (PULP PAPER RES INST [CA], et al); | [AD]US2004112997 (MATTHEW JOHN B [US], et al) | by applicant | DE2939587 | DE3602833 | US2004112997 |