EP3679762 - NEW RADIO BEAM MANAGEMENT REPORTING OPERATION WITH CONNECTED MODE DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSKELA, Timo Harjapäänkatu 32 B 30 90400 Oulu / FI | 02 /
KAIKKONEN, Jorma Kuuselantie 8 90800 Oulu / FI | 03 /
HAKOLA, Sami Peikontie 7 90450 Kempele / FI | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2020/29] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 18786394.9 | 05.09.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018IB56782 | Priority number, date | US201762556026P | 08.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762556026 P | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019049047 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3679762 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/28, H04B7/06 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
H04W76/28 (EP,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04B7/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Title | German: | NEUER FUNKSTRAHLMANAGEMENTMELDEBETRIEB MIT DISKONTINUIERLICHEM EMPFANG IM VERBUNDENEN MODUS | [2020/29] | English: | NEW RADIO BEAM MANAGEMENT REPORTING OPERATION WITH CONNECTED MODE DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION | [2020/29] | French: | NOUVELLE OPÉRATION DE RAPPORT DE GESTION DE FAISCEAU RADIO À RÉCEPTION DISCONTINUE EN MODE CONNECTÉ | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 08.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2017251518 (AGIWAL ANIL [KR], et al) [X] 1-35 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0147] - paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0155] * * paragraph [0192] * * paragraph [0197] - paragraph [0312] *; | [XP]EP3337055 (ASUSTEK COMP INC [TW]) [XP] 1-35 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0114] ** paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0155] *; | [X] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Consideration on beam management with C-DRX", vol. RAN WG2, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1704863 BEAM MANAGEMENT WITH DRX, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170514), XP051275378 [X] 1-35 * the whole document * | [X] - HUAWEI HISILICON, "UE power saving mechanism in High Frequency", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, Nevada, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161113), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-167875, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20161113), XP051177620 [X] 1-35 * the whole document * |