EP3732547 - SYSTEM-WIDE LOW POWER MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. 2485 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSIEN, Benjamin 6056 Nice Ter. Fremont, California 94555 / US | 02 /
DONLEY, Greggory D. 3584 Sunnylake Ct. San Jose, California 95117 / US | 03 /
BROUSSARD, Bryan P. 11616 Cherisse Dr. Austin, Texas 78739 / US | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/45] | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 18786482.2 | 20.09.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018US51916 | Priority number, date | US201715856546 | 28.12.2017 Original published format: US201715856546 | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019133085 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3732547 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/3234, G06F9/50 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
G06F1/3209 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/3287 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/3234 (EP,US);
G06F1/3296 (KR,US);
G06F9/5094 (EP,KR,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,KR);
Y02D30/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | SYSTEMWEITE VERWALTUNG VON NIEDRIGER LEISTUNG | [2020/45] | English: | SYSTEM-WIDE LOW POWER MANAGEMENT | [2020/45] | French: | GESTION D'UNE FAIBLE ALIMENTATION DANS UN SYSTÈME TOUT ENTIER | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 27.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/41] | 18.04.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.05.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011264934 (BRANOVER ALEXANDER [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012254526 (KALYANASUNDHARAM VYDHYANATHAN [US]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [XI]US2013311804 (GARG VIVEK [US], et al) [X] 1,13,17 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0080] * [I] 2-12,14-16,18-20 |