EP3687510 - ENHANCED DELIVERY EPINEPHRINE AND PRODRUG COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc. 30 Technology Drive Warren, NJ 07059 / US | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOBEL, Alexander, Mark 150 Island Sanctuary Vero Beach FL 32963 / US | 02 /
VARJAN, Stephanie, Marie 151 Prospect Avenue Oradell NJ 07649 / US | 03 /
WARGACKI, Stephen, Paul 18 Glacier Way Pittstown NJ 08867 / US | [2021/25] |
Former [2020/38] | 01 /
SCHOBEL, Alexander, Mark 6 Dermott Drive Whitehouse Station NJ 08889 / US | ||
02 /
VARJAN, Stephanie, Marie 151 Prospect Avenue Oradell NJ 07649 / US | |||
03 /
WARGACKI, Stephen, Paul 18 Glacier Way Pittstown NJ 08867 / US | |||
Former [2020/32] | 01 /
SCHOBEL, Alexander, Mark 6 Dermott Drive Whitehouse Station NJ 08889 / US | ||
02 /
VARJAN, Stephanie, Marie 151 Prospect Avenue Oradell NJ 07649 / US | |||
03 /
WARGACKI, Stephen, Paul 17 Indian Creek Rd. Annandale NJ 08801 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18786593.6 | 27.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018US53042 | Priority number, date | US201715717859 | 27.09.2017 Original published format: US201715717859 | US201715791249 | 23.10.2017 Original published format: US201715791249 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019067670 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3687510 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61K31/085 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
A61K9/7007 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/137 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/222 (EP,IL);
A61K31/235 (KR);
A61K31/335 (EP,IL);
A61K31/49 (EP,IL);
A61K47/06 (KR);
A61K47/10 (KR);
A61K47/12 (KR);
A61K47/34 (KR);
A61K47/38 (KR);
A61K47/46 (KR);
A61K9/006 (EP,IL,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE EPINEPHRIN- UND PRODRUG-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2020/32] | English: | ENHANCED DELIVERY EPINEPHRINE AND PRODRUG COMPOSITIONS | [2020/32] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ÉPINÉPHRINE ET DE PROMÉDICAMENT À ADMINISTRATION AMÉLIORÉE | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 16.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007202163 (RAWAS-QALAJI MUTASEM [CA], et al); | [XP]WO2017192921 (MONOSOL RX LLC [US]); | [XP]WO2017192923 (MONOSOL RX LLC [US]) | by applicant | US2005037055 | US7357891 | US7425292 | US8652378 | US8765167 |