EP3665542 - SELF-REGULATING SETTING DEVICE FOR A FLOW CONTROL VALVE, TEMPERATURE CONTROL SYSTEM AND DISTRIBUTION DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME, AND METHOD FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/25] | SELF-REGULATING ADJUSTMENT DEVICE FOR ATHROUGHFLOW REGULATION VALVE, A TEMPERATURE CONTROL SYSTEM AND A DISTRIBUTOR DEVICE HAVING THE SAME, AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | ||
[2020/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUT Edelstahl Umformtechnik GmbH Dr.-Troch-Strasse 17 99867 Gotha / DE | [2020/29] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states EUT Edelstahl Umformtechnik GmbH Dr. Troch Strasse 17 99867 Gotha / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRAUB, Thomas c/o EUT Edelstahl Umformtechnik GmbH Dr.-Troch-Straße 17 99867 Gotha / DE | 02 /
STRAUB, Philipp c/o EUT Edelstahl Umformtechnik GmbH Dr.-Troch-Straße 17 99867 Gotha / DE | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18786704.9 | 09.10.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018EP77418 | Priority number, date | DE201710123560 | 10.10.2017 Original published format: DE102017123560 | [2020/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019072813 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3665542 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3665542 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19, F24H1/00, F24D19/10 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
G05D23/1934 (EP,KR,RU);
F24D19/1018 (EP,KR,RU,US);
F24D19/10 (KR);
G05D23/1921 (EP,KR,RU);
F24D2220/0257 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTREGULIERENDE EINSTELLVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN DURCHFLUSSREGELVENTIL, EIN TEMPERIERUNGSSYSTEM ALS AUCH EINE VERTEILERVORRICHTUNG MIT DERSELBEN, SOWIE VERFAHREN HIERZU | [2020/25] | English: | SELF-REGULATING SETTING DEVICE FOR A FLOW CONTROL VALVE, TEMPERATURE CONTROL SYSTEM AND DISTRIBUTION DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME, AND METHOD FOR SAME | [2020/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE AUTORÉGULÉ POUR UNE VANNE DE RÉGULATION DE FLUIDE, SYSTÈME DE THERMORÉGULATION ET UN SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION COMPRENANT CELUI-CI, AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/25] | SELF-REGULATING ADJUSTMENT DEVICE FOR ATHROUGHFLOW REGULATION VALVE, A TEMPERATURE CONTROL SYSTEM AND A DISTRIBUTOR DEVICE HAVING THE SAME, AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | ||
Former [2020/25] | DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE AUTORÉGULATEUR POUR UNE SOUPAPE DE RÉGULATION DE DÉBIT, SYSTÈME DE MISE EN TEMPÉRATURE EN TANT QU'UN DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION POURVU DUDIT DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 13.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.12.2020 | CY | 02.12.2020 | EE | 02.12.2020 | LT | 02.12.2020 | LV | 02.12.2020 | MC | 02.12.2020 | MK | 02.12.2020 | MT | 02.12.2020 | RS | 02.12.2020 | SM | 02.12.2020 | BG | 02.03.2021 | NO | 02.03.2021 | IS | 02.04.2021 | PT | 05.04.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
MK | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | EE | 02.12.2020 | |
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 02.12.2020 | |
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | LV | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | LV | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 02.12.2020 | |
NO | 02.03.2021 | Cited in | International search | [YD]DE102006052124 (DANFOSS AS [DK]); | [XDYI]US2009314484 (BARRETT KEVIN [US], et al); | [Y]EP2679930 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [Y]US2014321839 (ARMSTRONG PETER MICHAEL [GB]); | [Y]WO2015148596 (GOOGLE INC [US]); | [Y]EP3012705 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) | Examination | DE102013014833 | by applicant | DE102006052124 | US2009314484 | DE102009004319 | EP2653789 | DE102014202738 | WO2015142879 | DE102015222110 |