EP3697566 - ARMOR COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto Schnell GmbH&Co. KG Neuer Weg 30-34 42111 Wuppertal / DE | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAWLIK, Mike Auf der Höhe 3 42553 Velbert / DE | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Oppermann, Frank OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann Wilhelminenstrasse 1a 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | Oppermann, Frank OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann LLP Wilhelminenstrasse 1a 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 18786772.6 | 15.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018EP78069 | Priority number, date | DE20171009753 | 19.10.2017 Original published format: DE102017009753 | [2020/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019076809 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3697566 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/30, B32B15/01, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/46, C22C38/48, C22C38/50, C22C38/56, F41H5/04, B32B15/18 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
F41H5/045 (EP);
B23K35/3086 (EP);
B32B15/011 (EP);
B32B15/18 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP);
C22C38/42 (EP);
C22C38/44 (EP);
C22C38/46 (EP);
C22C38/48 (EP);
C22C38/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Title | German: | PANZERUNGSBAUTEIL | [2020/35] | English: | ARMOR COMPONENT | [2020/35] | French: | PIÈCE STRUCTURALE DE RENFORT | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 11.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 19.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2021/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE2744905 (WAHL VERSCHLEISS TECH) [X] 1,3-8,10,12-14 * pages 7,9,11; figure 4; claims 1,2,4-6,8,9,12,13,24-26 * [A] 2 [I] 9,11,15; | [XA]US2006266207 (CERNY JAROSLAV [CZ], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0011] , [0029] , [0030] , [0032] , [0035] , [0042] - [0044]; claims 1,5 * [A] 2; | [XAI]DE9007336U (NEURO STAHLBAU GMBH UND CO) [X] 1,5-7,12-14 * pages 1,2; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [A] 2 [I] 15; | [XA]US2438759 (BENJAMIN LIEBOWITZ) [X] 1,3-5,7 * column 1, lines 1-6,36-55 * * column 2, lines 33-35 * * column 7, lines 58-62 * * figure 4; claim 1 * [A] 2; | [XAI]EP1152207 (WALZWERK BURG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7,12,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0010] - [0012]; claims 1,3,9,11,13,15 * [A] 2 [I] 15; | [XA]DE1578336 (FIUKOWSKI HANS) [X] 1,4,5,7 * pages 1,2; figure 1; claims 1-4 * [A] 2 | by applicant | EP0247020 | DE102013103944 | DE2744905 |