EP3610612 - DATAFLOW TRIGGERED TASKS FOR ACCELERATED DEEP LEARNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cerebras Systems Inc. 1237 E. Arques Ave Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2021/29] |
Former [2020/08] | For all designated states Cerebras Systems Inc. 175 S. San Antonio Road, 100 Los Altos, California 94022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIE, Sean Los Altos, California 94022 / US | 02 /
LAUTERBACH, Gary R. 128 Bridgton Court Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 03 /
JAMES, Michael Edwin 232 Beverly Drive San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 04 /
MORRISON, Michael 1072 Cornflower Court Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 05 /
AREKAPUDI, Srikanth 11490 Old Ranch Rd Los Altos Hills, CA 94024 / US | [2022/38] |
Former [2021/29] | 01 /
LIE, Sean 100 Highland Oaks Drive Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | ||
02 /
LAUTERBACH, Gary R. 128 Bridgton Court Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
03 /
JAMES, Michael Edwin 232 Beverly Drive San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
04 /
MORRISON, Michael 1072 Cornflower Court Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | |||
05 /
AREKAPUDI, Srikanth 11490 Old Ranch Rd Los Altos Hills, CA 94024 / US | |||
Former [2020/08] | 01 /
LIE, Sean 100 Highland Oaks Drive Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | ||
02 /
LAUTERBACH, Gary R. 128 Bridgton Court Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
03 /
JAMES, Michael Edwin 232 Beverly Drive San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
04 /
MORRISON, Michael 1072 Cornflower Court Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | |||
05 /
AREKAPUDI, Srikanth 470 Kiely Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2020/08] | Application number, filing date | 18786968.0 | 15.04.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018IB52606 | Priority number, date | US201762486372P | 17.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762486372 P | US201762517949P | 11.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762517949 P | US201762520433P | 15.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762520433 P | US201762522065P | 19.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762522065 P | US201762522081P | 19.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762522081 P | US201762542645P | 08.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762542645 P | US201762542657P | 08.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762542657 P | US201762580207P | 01.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762580207 P | US201862628773P | 09.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862628773 P | US201862628784P | 09.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862628784 P | US201862652933P | 05.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862652933 P | US201862655210P | 09.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862655210 P | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018193352 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3610612 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3610612 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, G06F15/80, G06F15/173, G06N3/08, G06N3/063, G06F9/38, H04L12/54, // G06N3/04 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
G06N3/063 (EP,US);
G06F15/825 (US);
G06F13/00 (US);
G06F17/16 (US);
G06F9/30036 (EP,US);
G06F9/3005 (EP,US);
G06F9/3016 (US);
G06F9/30192 (US);
G06F9/323 (EP,US);
G06F9/324 (US);
G06F9/3802 (EP);
G06F9/3836 (US);
G06F9/3851 (EP,US);
G06F9/3887 (EP,US);
G06F9/45533 (US);
G06F9/4881 (US);
G06F9/5077 (EP);
G06F9/52 (US);
G06N3/04 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06N3/048 (EP);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N3/084 (EP,US);
G06N3/044 (EP);
G06N3/047 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/08] | H04L12/751, H04L12/721, H04L12/801, H04L12/713 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENFLUSSAUSGELÖSTE AUFGABEN ZUM BESCHLEUNIGTEN TIEFENLERNEN | [2020/08] | English: | DATAFLOW TRIGGERED TASKS FOR ACCELERATED DEEP LEARNING | [2020/08] | French: | TÂCHES DÉCLENCHÉES PAR UN FLUX DE DONNÉES POUR APPRENTISSAGE PROFOND ACCÉLÉRÉ | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 14.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 15.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.09.2022 | AT | 28.09.2022 | CZ | 28.09.2022 | DK | 28.09.2022 | EE | 28.09.2022 | ES | 28.09.2022 | FI | 28.09.2022 | HR | 28.09.2022 | IT | 28.09.2022 | LT | 28.09.2022 | LV | 28.09.2022 | MC | 28.09.2022 | NL | 28.09.2022 | PL | 28.09.2022 | RO | 28.09.2022 | RS | 28.09.2022 | SE | 28.09.2022 | SI | 28.09.2022 | SK | 28.09.2022 | SM | 28.09.2022 | NO | 28.12.2022 | GR | 29.12.2022 | IS | 28.01.2023 | PT | 30.01.2023 | LU | 15.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 15.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007140240 (DALLY WILLIAM J [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2007058557 (CUFFARO ANGELO [CA], et al); | [Y]US2011313961 (TOSCANO ORAZIO [IT], et al); | [A]US2013031040 (MODHA DHARMENDRA S [US]); | [Y]US2013198488 (PECHANEK GERALD GEORGE [US]); | [A]US2016328647 (LIN DEXU [US], et al) |