EP3612414 - TUBE MOUNTS FOR USE ON TUBULAR FEATURES OF VEHICLES TO MOUNT A VARIETY OF VEHICLE ACCESSORIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Burton, Thomas 4998 Steel Ridge Road Red House, West Virginia 25168 / US | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2020/09] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 18788518.1 | 20.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018US28667 | Priority number, date | US201715493473 | 21.04.2017 Original published format: US201715493473 | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018195492 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612414 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3612414 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/00, B60R11/00, B60J11/00 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
B60R9/058 (EP,IL,US);
B60R11/00 (IL)
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | B60R9/00, B60R11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHRHALTERUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG AUF ROHRFÖRMIGEN MERKMALEN VON FAHRZEUGEN ZUR ANBRINGUNG EINER GRUPPE VON FAHRZEUGZUBEHÖR | [2020/09] | English: | TUBE MOUNTS FOR USE ON TUBULAR FEATURES OF VEHICLES TO MOUNT A VARIETY OF VEHICLE ACCESSORIES | [2020/09] | French: | SUPPORTS DE TUBES DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS SUR DES ÉLÉMENTS TUBULAIRES DE VÉHICULES AFIN DE MONTER DIVERS ACCESSOIRES DE VÉHICULE | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 07.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5138901 (DABANDJIAN ARA N [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,9 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 50; figures 1,3-9 *; | [X]US5829316 (KRIZMAN JR JOHN [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 19; figures 1,2,5,13,14 *; | [Y]US6283310 (DEAN GREGORY A [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,7 * figures 14,15 *; | [A]US6953201 (VANDEMORTEL DENNIS R [US]) [A] 4,5,7* figure 29 *; | [XY]EP3141469 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0088]; figure 7 * [Y] 4,5,7; | [XP]WO2017142936 (SMITH LANCE [US]) [XP] 1-3,6,8,9 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 2; figures 1,2,14-16 * | International search | [A]FR2270472 (CROS JACQUES [FR])[A] 0; | [X]US2014252188 (WEBSTER MARC W [US]) [X] 10, 14 * Figure 9 and corresponding text in the description *; | [A]US2017050577 (LINDHOLM OLOF [SE], et al) [A] 0 | [X] - "Barrel mount for weaver rail???", shotgunworld.com, URL: http://www.shotgunworld.com/bbs/viewtopic.php?t=209505, (20180524) [X] 1-20 * Whole document Whole document * | by applicant | USD319966S | US5138901 | EP3141469 |