EP3688717 - METHOD FOR EXECUTING SMART CONTRACTS THROUGH ELECTRONIC PROCESSING MEANS USING THE BLOCKCHAIN TECHNOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shared Technologies S.r.l. Via Fondazza, 53 40125 Bologna / IT | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUERRIERI, Roberto c/o Shared Technologies S.r.l. Via Fondazza, 53 I-40125 Bologna / IT | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Brunazzi, Stefano Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18789219.5 | 24.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018IB57357 | Priority number, date | IT20170107125 | 25.09.2017 Original published format: IT201700107125 | [2020/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019058340 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3688717 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/18 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
G06Q50/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUSFÜHREN VON INTELLIGENTEN VERTRÄGEN DURCH ELEKTRONISCHE VERARBEITUNGSMITTEL UNTER VERWENDUNG DER BLOCKKETTENTECHNOLOGIE | [2020/32] | English: | METHOD FOR EXECUTING SMART CONTRACTS THROUGH ELECTRONIC PROCESSING MEANS USING THE BLOCKCHAIN TECHNOLOGY | [2020/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXÉCUTION DE CONTRATS INTELLIGENTS PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UN MOYEN DE TRAITEMENT ÉLECTRONIQUE UTILISANT LA TECHNOLOGIE DE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 25.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/20] | 09.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2017046694 (CHOW ARTHUR CARROLL [CA], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0176] - [0184] *; | [I]US2017140408 (WUEHLER MICHAEL [US]) [I] 1-11* paragraphs [0037] - [0080] * |