EP3701548 - LIGHTWEIGHT CARBON NANOTUBE CABLE COMPRISING A PAIR OF PLATED TWISTED WIRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation 2980 Fairview Park Drive Falls Church, VA 22042-4511 / US | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYON, Bradley, J. 1470 Pheasant Trail Court Hoffman Estates, IL 60192 / US | 02 /
KIM, Nana 1908 Vanderbilt Lane Unit B Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US | 03 /
PENG, Hsiao-Hu 26574 Basswood Avenue Rancho Palo Verdes, CA 90275 / US | 04 /
STARKOVICH, John, A. 18226 Mansel Avenue Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US | 05 /
SILVERMAN, Edward, M. 16482 Dorado Drive Encino, CA 91436 / US | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | CSY Herts Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 18789534.7 | 25.09.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018US52604 | Priority number, date | US201715791730 | 24.10.2017 Original published format: US201715791730 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019083665 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701548 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/04 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
C25D5/54 (EP,US);
H01B7/18 (US);
C01B32/168 (US);
C25D3/38 (US);
C25D7/0607 (EP,US);
H01B1/04 (EP,US);
H01B11/20 (EP,US);
H01B13/0207 (US);
H01B13/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | LEICHTES KOHLENSTOFFNANORÖHRCHENKABEL MIT EINEM PAAR PLATTIERTER VERDRILLTER DRÄHTE | [2020/36] | English: | LIGHTWEIGHT CARBON NANOTUBE CABLE COMPRISING A PAIR OF PLATED TWISTED WIRES | [2020/36] | French: | CÂBLE DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE LÉGER COMPRENANT UNE PAIRE DE FILS TORSADÉS PLAQUÉS | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 06.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]CN107068254 ; | [XI]US2009194313 (JIANG KAI-LI [CN], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-15,18-22,28 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0023] , [0025] , [0033]; claims 1, 3, 9-11, 16, 17 * [I] 6,16,17,27; | [XI]US2011005808 (WHITE BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9-15,18-26,28,29 * paragraphs [0079] - [0083] - [0 87] , [0 90] - [0092] - [ 105] , [ 106] , [0120] * [I] 4-6,8,16,17,27; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (20170818), vol. 2017, no. 72, Database accession no. 2017-580002, XP002786924 & CN107068254 A 20170818 (ANHUI AICS TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,9,11-15 * abstract * * page 2 * [I] 6,16,17 |