EP3618452 - CONTROL SYSTEM, SCENE CONTROL EXECUTION METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/10] | CONTROL SYSTEM, EXECUTION METHOD OF SCENE CONTROL, AND PROGRAM | ||
[2020/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIZU, Kazuhiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuoku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
JULAYHI, Jasmeen c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
SATOU, Minoru c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
MASUDA, Rikiya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
OHNO, Masami c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
IMAI, Tomikazu c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18790034.5 | 05.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018JP14510 | Priority number, date | JP20170085360 | 24.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017085360 | [2020/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018198701 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3618452 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3618452 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/00, E05F15/71, E05F15/77, E05F15/79, F24F11/52, G06F13/00, G08C17/02 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
G08C17/02 (EP);
F24F11/52 (EP,US);
E05F15/71 (EP,US);
E05F15/77 (EP);
E05F15/79 (EP);
G05B15/02 (US);
G06F13/00 (EP);
H04Q9/00 (EP);
E05Y2400/45 (US);
E05Y2900/146 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/10] | H04Q9/00, E05F15/71, E05F15/77, E05F15/79, F24F11/52, G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSYSTEM, AUSFÜHRUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR SZENENSTEUERUNG UND PROGRAMM | [2020/10] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM, SCENE CONTROL EXECUTION METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2020/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE, PROCÉDÉ D'EXÉCUTION DE COMMANDE DE SCÈNE ET PROGRAMME | [2020/10] |
Former [2020/10] | CONTROL SYSTEM, EXECUTION METHOD OF SCENE CONTROL, AND PROGRAM | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2019 | Translation filed | 18.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 08.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2018 | AL | 09.06.2021 | AT | 09.06.2021 | CY | 09.06.2021 | CZ | 09.06.2021 | DK | 09.06.2021 | EE | 09.06.2021 | ES | 09.06.2021 | FI | 09.06.2021 | HR | 09.06.2021 | IT | 09.06.2021 | LT | 09.06.2021 | LV | 09.06.2021 | MC | 09.06.2021 | MK | 09.06.2021 | NL | 09.06.2021 | PL | 09.06.2021 | RO | 09.06.2021 | RS | 09.06.2021 | SE | 09.06.2021 | SI | 09.06.2021 | SK | 09.06.2021 | SM | 09.06.2021 | BG | 09.09.2021 | NO | 09.09.2021 | GR | 10.09.2021 | IS | 09.10.2021 | PT | 11.10.2021 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
MK | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6080048 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0001] * * claim 1 *; | [XY]JP2008191757 (TOHO GAS KK, et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-11,14,15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0040] * * claim 1 * [Y] 3,4,8; | [X]JP2014174762 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE, et al) [X] 1,5-7,9-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0097] * * claim 1 *; | [Y]US2016054017 (TAKAHASHI HAYATO [JP]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0015] ** paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0087] * | International search | [Y]JPS6080048 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 3 * , page 2, upper left column, line 14 to lower right column, line 18, fig. 3-6 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2002173975 (UNITIKA GLASS FIBER CO LTD) [Y] 5 * , paragraphs [0011], [0019] (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2008191757 (TOHO GAS KK, et al) [X] 1-2, 6-10, 12, 14-15 * , paragraphs [0021]-[0034], fig. 1-4 (Family: none) * [Y] 3-5, 11, 13; | [A]JP2010112044 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1-15* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2011081982 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 4; | [Y]JP2013223381 (TOYOTA HOME KK) [Y] 13 * , paragraphs [0053]-[0061], fig. 2-3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2015173931 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 11 * , paragraphs [0010]-[0044], fig. 1-7 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2016225681 (BUNKA SHUTTER) [Y] 4 * , paragraph [0069] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2015135226 |