EP3615463 - PASSIVE EDGE GUIDING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JERRY, Glen A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
SWANSON, Ronald P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
GOYAL, Ameeta R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
DOBBS, James N. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | Mathys & Squire Mathys & Squire Europe LLP Maximilianstraße 35 Eingang A 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18790706.8 | 20.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018IB52782 | Priority number, date | US201762491605P | 28.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762491605 P | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018198007 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3615463 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65H27/00, B65H23/032, B65H23/038 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
B65H23/0322 (EP,US);
B65H23/0324 (US);
B65H23/038 (EP,US);
B65H27/00 (EP);
B65H2404/1321 (EP);
B65H2404/14212 (EP,US);
B65H2404/15212 (EP);
B65H2601/2532 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1315 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1752 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/10] | B65H23/00, B65H27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR PASSIVE RANDFÜHRUNG | [2020/10] | English: | PASSIVE EDGE GUIDING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2020/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE GUIDAGE DE BORD PASSIF | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 06.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016106043 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9720764 (SERVANTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO2016106043 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 1-20 * See page 7, line 9 - page 11, line 29; claims 1-13; and figures 2A-2B, 6. *; | [Y]WO9720764 (SERVANTS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See page 17, line 17 - page 18, line 19; claim 35; and figures 23-25. *; | [A]US2010252605 (LYCETTE MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0028]; and figures 1-6. *; | [A]US2014020627 (KANO MITSURU [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * See claims 1-17; and figures 12A-12B, 17-18, 19A-19C, 20A-20B. *; | [A]US2010054826 (HIEDA TOYOAKI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0051]-[0073]; and figures 1-3, 4A-4B, 5-9. * |