EP3615514 - PROPIONIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aviara Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 3331 Green Tree Park Houston, TX 77007-8371 / US | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIEDIGER, Ronald, J. 5311 Golden Wings Ct. Houston, TX 77041 / US | 02 /
BENISH, Michele, A. 6 Barlow Ct. The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US | 03 /
HARDY, Lindsay, Bonner 37 Winthrop Rd. Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 04 /
BOYD, Vincent, A. 13135 FM 850 Tyler, TX 75707 / US | 05 /
MARKET, Robert, V. 11408 Rashell Way Pearland, TX 77584 / US | 06 /
THRASH, Thomas, P. 4430 Wigton Dr. Houston, TX 77096 / US | 07 /
YOUNG, Brandon, M. 8132 Effingham Dr. Germantown, TN 38138 / US | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18791126.8 | 25.06.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018US39289 | Priority number, date | US201715497414 | 26.04.2017 Original published format: US201715497414 | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018201167 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3615514 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3615514 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 20.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/75, C07D221/04, C07D237/22, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D409/14, C07D413/12, C07D413/14, C07D417/12, C07D471/00, C07D471/04, C07D495/04, A61K31/435, A61K31/4353, A61K31/4375, A61K31/4412, A61K31/443, A61K31/4436, A61K31/4439, A61P35/00 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
C07D213/75 (EP,US);
C07D498/04 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07D207/327 (EP,US);
C07D207/333 (EP,US);
C07D209/08 (EP,US);
C07D213/48 (EP,US);
C07D213/55 (EP,US);
C07D213/64 (EP,US);
C07D213/69 (EP,US);
C07D221/04 (EP,US);
C07D221/18 (US);
C07D231/16 (EP,US);
C07D237/14 (US);
C07D237/22 (EP,US);
C07D261/08 (EP,US);
C07D307/54 (EP,US);
C07D333/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/10] | C07D213/75, C07D221/04, C07D237/22, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D409/14, C07D413/12, C07D413/14, C07D417/12, C07D471/00, C07D471/04, C07D495/04, A61K31/435, A61K31/4353, A61K31/4375, A61K31/4412, A61K31/443, A61K31/4436, A61K31/4439 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROPIONSÄUREDERIVATE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2020/10] | English: | PROPIONIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2020/10] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'ACIDE PROPIONIQUE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2018 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 26.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 15.01.2020 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 30.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.06.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 29.06.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 30.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.07.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO0067746 (TEXAS BIOTECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * , claims 1-10, 13-15, abstract *; | [A]WO0068188 (TEXAS BIOTECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * , claims, abstract *; | [A]US6262084 (BIEDIGER RONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-22* , claims, abstract *; | [X]EP1203766 (TEXAS BIOTECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [X] 1-22 * , claims 1-19, 30, 31, paragraphs [0073], [0074], [0151], abstract * | by applicant | US781203 | EP0341915 | EP0422938 | US5192746 | WO9515973 | WO9606108 | US5510332 | WO9622966 | WO9804247 | WO9804913 | US6262084 | US6723711 | US2004234624 | WO2005014534 | US6972296 |