EP3616888 - SHEET WINDING MOLDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINCHI Tomoaki c/o DIC Corporation Sakai Plant 3 Takasago 1-chome Takaishi-shi Osaka 592-0001 / JP | 02 /
KAWANO Yasushi c/o DIC Corporation 7-20 Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8233 / JP | 03 /
NONAKA Shinichi c/o DIC Corporation Sakai Plant 3 Takasago 1-chome Takaishi-shi Osaka 592-0001 / JP | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18791225.8 | 12.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018JP15359 | Priority number, date | JP20170088322 | 27.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017088322 | [2020/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018198795 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3616888 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3616888 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/32, C08J5/24, B29C53/84, C08J5/04, // B29C35/02, B29C53/56, B29C53/80 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
B29C53/845 (EP);
B29C70/16 (KR,US);
B29C53/8066 (EP,US);
B29C70/32 (EP,KR,US);
B29C70/54 (KR);
C08J5/04 (EP);
C08J5/24 (KR);
C08J5/243 (EP,US);
B29C35/0288 (EP);
B29C53/56 (EP);
B29K2101/10 (KR,US);
B29K2663/00 (US);
C08J2333/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/46] | B29C70/32, C08J5/24, B29C35/02, B29C53/84 | ||
Former IPC [2020/10] | B29C70/32, B29C70/16, C08J5/24, B29K101/10, B29K105/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOLIENWICKELFORMVERFAHREN | [2020/10] | English: | SHEET WINDING MOLDING METHOD | [2020/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE PAR ENROULEMENT DE FEUILLE | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2019 | Translation filed | 18.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 23.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 10.08.2022 | AT | 10.08.2022 | CZ | 10.08.2022 | DK | 10.08.2022 | EE | 10.08.2022 | ES | 10.08.2022 | FI | 10.08.2022 | HR | 10.08.2022 | IT | 10.08.2022 | LT | 10.08.2022 | LV | 10.08.2022 | MC | 10.08.2022 | NL | 10.08.2022 | PL | 10.08.2022 | RO | 10.08.2022 | RS | 10.08.2022 | SE | 10.08.2022 | SI | 10.08.2022 | SK | 10.08.2022 | SM | 10.08.2022 | NO | 10.11.2022 | GR | 11.11.2022 | IS | 10.12.2022 | PT | 12.12.2022 | GB | 12.04.2023 | IE | 12.04.2023 | LU | 12.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | FR | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2023 | ||
IE | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
FR | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
FR | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH02113927 (MAZDA MOTOR) [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP1191253 (TORAY COMPOSITES AMERICA INC [US]) [Y] 1-3 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014]; figure 2 *; | [Y]JP2004099814 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0011] *; | [A]US2009236091 (HAMMAMI AHMED [CA], et al) [A] 1-4* paragraph [0031]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2010025412 (WAKAO YOSHITAKA [JP]) [A] 1-4 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2010260955 (HASEGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016280871 (KANEKO TORU [JP]) [A] 1-4 | International search | [A]JPH02113927 (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1-4* , *; | [Y]JP2002355893 (TORAY COMPOSITES AMERICA INC) [Y] 1-4 * , [0007]-[0010], [0013] & US 2002/0056782 A1 [0010],[0021],[0023] & EP 1191253 A1 *; | [A]JP2004099814 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-4 * , *; | [Y]JP2008143029 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-4 * , *; | [Y]JP2010260344 (SRI SPORTS LTD) [Y] 1-4 * , *; | [A]JP2016098322 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [A] 1-4 * , * | by applicant | JP2015127386 |