EP3704387 - ASSEMBLY WITH A SUPPORT RAIL AND HOUSINGS MOUNTED SIDE BY SIDE THEREON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/37] | ASSEMBLY COMPRISING A SUPPORT RAIL AND HOUSINGS STRINGED TOGETHER ON SAID SUPPORT RAIL | ||
[2023/52] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG Klingenbergstrasse 26 32758 Detmold / DE | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AVENHAUS, Eike Brombergerstrasse 10 32545 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | 02 /
GIESBRECHT, Peter Memelstrasse 57 32756 Detmold / DE | 03 /
DIEKMANN, Jörg Im Stillen Winkel 25 33813 Oerlinghausen / DE | 04 /
MEYER, Peter Ahmser Str. 72 32107 Bad Salzuflen / DE | 05 /
NEUMANN, Genadij Bültenhof 9 32758 Detmold / DE | 06 /
REMKE, Andre Marktstrasse 17 48369 Saerbeck / DE | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 18795329.4 | 18.10.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018EP78534 | Priority number, date | DE201720106653U | 03.11.2017 Original published format: DE 202017106653 U | [2020/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019086260 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3704387 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3704387 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/06, H02B1/052, H02B1/32, F16B13/06, F16B21/08, F16B21/09, H02B1/048 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
H02B1/32 (EP);
H02B1/042 (EP,US);
F16B21/08 (EP,US);
F16B21/09 (EP,US);
F16B5/0642 (EP);
F16B5/0664 (EP);
H01R4/305 (US);
H01R4/64 (US);
H02B1/052 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG MIT EINER TRAGSCHIENE UND DARAUF ANEINANDERGEREIHTEN GEHÄUSEN | [2020/37] | English: | ASSEMBLY WITH A SUPPORT RAIL AND HOUSINGS MOUNTED SIDE BY SIDE THEREON | [2023/52] | French: | AGENCEMENT COMPRENANT UN RAIL SUPPORT ET DES BOÎTIERS MONTÉS CÔTE À CÔTE SUR LE RAIL | [2023/52] |
Former [2020/37] | ASSEMBLY COMPRISING A SUPPORT RAIL AND HOUSINGS STRINGED TOGETHER ON SAID SUPPORT RAIL | ||
Former [2020/37] | ENSEMBLE COMPORTANT UN RAIL DE SUPPORT ET DES BOÎTIERS JUXTAPOSÉS PLACÉS SUR CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 08.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3702137 (EVANS ROBERT J); | [A]GB2219622 (WEBER SRL [IT]); | [Y]GB2234546 (KENTINENTAL ENG [GB]); | [A]FR2719184 (NOZICK JACQUES [FR]); | [A]DE19859716 (MOELLER GMBH [DE]); | [XI]US6378825 (YEE EDGAR [US], et al); | [Y]US2002192047 (WILLE LOTHAR [DE]); | [Y]EP1376793 (HAGER ELECTRO GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US2017197668 (MIYAMOTO MAKOTO [US], et al) | Examination | EP0017124 | DE102012102170 |