EP3864781 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SUPPORTING HARQ [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EPSTEIN, Leonid c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | 02 /
BEN-ARIE, Yaron c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | 03 /
MELZER, Ezer c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | 04 /
SHILO, Shimon c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18795388.0 | 22.10.2018 | [2021/33] | WO2018EP78895 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020083464 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3864781 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L1/18 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L1/0045 (EP);
H04L1/0047 (US);
H04L1/0059 (US);
H04L1/007 (EP);
H04L1/0072 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM STÜTZEN VON HARQ | [2021/33] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SUPPORTING HARQ | [2021/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SUPPORTER HARQ | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 11.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2010180173 (BATRA ANUJ [US], et al) [X] 1,5,10-13,15,16 * paragraph [0023]; figure 2 * * figures 7,8,9 * * paragraph [0082]; figure 11 * [I] 2-4,6-9,14; | [A]US2012237036 (DABAK ANAND [US], et al) [A] 2,6-9 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] *; | [A]US2017126456 (LEE DAE WON [US], et al) [A] 3,4,14* paragraph [0095] * |