EP3703794 - INJECTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LISCIO, Edward c/o SANOFI U.S. 55 Corporate Drive Mail-Code:55A-505A Brigdewater New Jersey, Brigdewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Hudson, George Alec, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 18795598.4 | 30.10.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018EP79688 | Priority number, date | EP20170306489 | 30.10.2017 Original published format: EP 17306489 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019086443 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3703794 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/28, A61M5/20, A61M5/315, A61M5/32, A61M5/24 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
A61M5/2033 (EP,US);
A61M5/3245 (US);
A61M5/31513 (US);
A61M5/3257 (US);
A61M2005/206 (US);
A61M2005/208 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2474 (EP);
A61M2005/3247 (US);
A61M2005/3267 (EP,US);
A61M5/2466 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | INJEKTORVORRICHTUNG | [2020/37] | English: | INJECTOR DEVICE | [2020/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF INJECTEUR | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 02.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013197474 (BILTON SIMON LEWIS [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0102] , [0103] * * figures 1-4A *; | [Y]US2016287787 (RIEDEL STEPHAN [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0093] ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2017089276 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 10, line 28 - page 11, line 34 * * figures 5-7 *; | [Y]US2017304542 (HELMER MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0043] - [0055] * * figures 1-3 * |