EP3853712 - OPERATING MODES THAT DESIGNATE AN INTERFACE MODALITY FOR INTERACTING WITH AN AUTOMATED ASSISTANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAN, Haywai 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 18796192.5 | 08.10.2018 | [2021/30] | WO2018US54862 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020076288 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3853712 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/16 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/167 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (US);
G06F3/04847 (US);
G06F3/04883 (US);
G06F3/04886 (US);
G06F40/56 (US);
G10L13/00 (US);
G10L15/00 (US);
G10L15/1815 (US);
G10L15/22 (US);
H04B1/3827 (US);
H04W4/80 (US);
H04W48/02 (US);
G10L2015/088 (US);
G10L2015/223 (US);
G10L2015/228 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | BETRIEBSMODI, DIE EINE SCHNITTSTELLENMODALITÄT ZUR INTERAKTION MIT EINEM AUTOMATISIERTEN ASSISTENTEN BESTIMMEN | [2021/30] | English: | OPERATING MODES THAT DESIGNATE AN INTERFACE MODALITY FOR INTERACTING WITH AN AUTOMATED ASSISTANT | [2021/30] | French: | MODES DE FONCTIONNEMENT QUI DÉSIGNENT UNE MODALITÉ D'INTERFACE POUR ENTRER EN INTERACTION AVEC UN ASSISTANT AUTOMATISÉ | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 09.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010054373 (GOOGLE INC [US], et al); | [I]EP2648077 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [XI]US2014222436 (BINDER JUSTIN [US], et al); | [A]US2018018965 (DALEY MICHAEL J [US]); | [I]US2018136824 (KNOPPERT MICHIEL [NL], et al) |