EP3706662 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A MOLDED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vita Zahnfabrik H. Rauter GmbH & Co. KG Spitalgasse 3 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | For all designated states imes-icore GmbH Im Leibolzgraben 16 36132 Eiterfeld / DE | For all designated states Technische Universität Darmstadt Dezernat Forschung Karolinenplatz 5 64289 Darmstadt / DE | [2023/02] |
Former [2022/48] | For all designated states Vita Zahnfabrik H. Rauter GmbH & Co. KG Spitalgasse 3 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | ||
For all designated states imes-icore GmbH Im Leibolzgraben 16 36132 Eiterfeld / DE | |||
For all designated states Technische Universität Darmstadt Otto-Berndt-Str. 2 64287 Darmstadt / DE | |||
Former [2020/38] | For all designated states Vita Zahnfabrik H. Rauter GmbH & Co. KG Spitalgasse 3 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | ||
For all designated states Imes-Icore GmbH Im Leibolzgraben 16 36132 Eiterfeld / DE | |||
For all designated states Technische Universität Darmstadt Otto-Berndt-Str. 2 64287 Darmstadt / DE | |||
For all designated states Form for Function Fräszentrum GmbH Wilhelmienenstr. 25 64283 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOBST, Thomas Haardtring 375 64295 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
ELLERBROCK, Christof Rotweinstraße 8 55218 Ingelheim / DE | 03 /
KIRSTEN, Armin Friedrichstraße 46 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | 04 /
STARK, Christoph Ferdinand-Braun-Strasse 22 36039 Fulda / DE | 05 /
ULLRICH, Sebastian Eisenacher Weg 8 36088 Hünfeld / DE | 06 /
STEINMETZ, Christian Immanuel-Kant-Straße 48 63303 Dreieich / DE | 07 /
HEISTER, Reinhard Am Sportfeld 28 63110 Rodgau / DE | 08 /
DEJKUN, Vitali Graupnerweg 42 64287 Darmstadt / DE | 09 /
MISCHLIWSKI, Stefan Burkhardstr. 11 67549 Worms / DE | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 18796679.1 | 08.11.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018EP80649 | Priority number, date | EP20170201063 | 10.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17201063 | [2020/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019092124 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3706662 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/00, A61C5/77 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
A61C13/0004 (EP,KR,US);
A61C13/0006 (KR);
A61C13/0007 (KR);
A61C13/0018 (KR,US);
A61C13/0022 (EP,KR,US);
A61C13/02 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FORMKÖRPERS | [2020/38] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A MOLDED PRODUCT | [2020/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CORPS FAÇONNÉ | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 30.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]DE19922870 (WEIGL PAUL [DE], et al) [ID] 1-14 * column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 49; figures 1,5 *; | [I]US2004245663 (MACDOUGALD JOSEPH A [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]US2011095048 (WAGNER INGO W [DE], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0114] * | by applicant | DE19922870 | US2004245663 | DE102009011175 | DE102010037160 | US2016129528 | US2017008127 | US2017057011 |