EP3697371 - OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION BASED ON ESSENTIAL OILS, AND FORMULATED WITHOUT SURFACTANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genialis Biotech Lieu dit les Talbots 18250 Henrichemont / FR | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESJARDINS-LAVISSE, Isabelle Lieu dit les Talbots 18250 Henrichemont / FR | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 18796739.3 | 16.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018FR52569 | Priority number, date | FR20170071085 | 16.10.2017 Original published format: FR 1771085 | FR20180053190 | 12.04.2018 Original published format: FR 1853190 | [2020/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019077258 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3697371 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/14, A61K36/61, A61K36/75, A61K36/53, A61K45/06, A61K8/06, A61K9/107, A61P21/02 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
A61K9/107 (EP);
A61K36/14 (EP);
A61K36/53 (EP);
A61K36/534 (EP);
A61K36/61 (EP);
A61K36/75 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K47/36 (EP);
A61K47/44 (EP);
A61K8/062 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/14, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/53, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/61, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/75, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/35] | A61K8/06, A61K9/107, A61K36/53, A61K36/75, A61K36/61, A61K36/14, A61P21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Title | German: | ÖL-IN-WASSER-EMULSION AUF DER BASIS ÄTHERISCHER ÖLE UND OHNE TENSID | [2020/35] | English: | OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION BASED ON ESSENTIAL OILS, AND FORMULATED WITHOUT SURFACTANT | [2020/35] | French: | EMULSION HUILE-DANS-EAU A BASE D'HUILES ESSENTIELLES ET FORMULEE SANS TENSIO-ACTIF | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 16.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/30] | 21.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2010149668 (SAS GENIALIS [FR], et al) [X] 1 * page 4, lines 1-18; claims 1,4-5 * * page 6, line 26 * [Y] 2-4,7-10; | [A]FR2973706 (N GUYEN GERARD DUC [FR]) [A] 5,6* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2013150044 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-4,7-10 * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 16; examples 1,2; claim 1 * * page 9, line 4 * * page 17, line 34 - page 18, line 26 *; | [Y]WO2016063119 (UNIVERSITÁ DEGLI STUDI DI PAVIA [IT]) [Y] 1-4,7-10 * page 3, lines 21-30; claim 1 *; | [A]US2017281581 (BROWN BETH ANNE-SZKUDLAREK [US], et al) [A] 5,6 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2720644 | FR2722116 | FR2750327 | CA2295533 | FR2771293 | US6416748 | WO2010149668 |