EP3724667 - HIGH-FREQUENCY TEST CONNECTOR DEVICE, HIGH-FREQUENCY TESTING SYSTEM AND USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingun Prüfmittelbau GmbH Max-Stromeyer-Str. 162 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRODI, Thomas Wollmatingerstraße 129 78467 Konstanz / DE | 02 /
BÖHLER, Dominik Turnierstraße 39 78462 Konstanz / DE | 03 /
NEHER, Michael Sierenmoosstraße 16 78464 Konstanz / DE | 04 /
AWANO, Nebiat Max-Stromeyer-Strasse 162 78467 Konstanz / DE | 05 /
ROYAK, Sergiy Max-Stromeyer-Srtrasse 162 78467 Konstanz / DE | 06 /
NEUMANN, Pascal Max-Stromeyer-Srtrasse 162 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behrmann Wagner PartG mbB Hegau-Tower Maggistraße 5 (11. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/43] | Patentanwälte Behrmann Wagner PartG mbB Hegau-Tower Maggistraße 5 (11. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | Application number, filing date | 18796857.3 | 22.10.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018EP78908 | Priority number, date | DE201710130015 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017130015 | [2020/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019115071 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3724667 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/04, H01R24/40, G01R1/067, H01R13/24 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
G01R1/06772 (EP,KR,US);
G01R1/0416 (KR);
G01R1/06722 (US);
G01R1/06733 (US);
G01R23/02 (KR);
H01R13/2421 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/2457 (EP,KR,US);
H01R24/40 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZ-PRÜFSTECKERVORRICHTUNG, HOCHFREQUENZ-PRÜFSYSTEM UND VERWENDUNG VON SOLCHEN | [2020/43] | English: | HIGH-FREQUENCY TEST CONNECTOR DEVICE, HIGH-FREQUENCY TESTING SYSTEM AND USE OF SAME | [2020/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FICHE DE TEST À HAUTE FRÉQUENCE, SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE À HAUTE FRÉQUENCE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 06.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2336948 (3COM TECHNOLOGIES LTD [KY]); | [A]US2007004238 (BREINLINGER KEITH J [US], et al); | [A]US2007197099 (DISTEFANO THOMAS H [US]); | [A]US2007269999 (DI STEFANO THOMAS H [US]); | [XI]DE202010007229U (INGUN PRUEFMITTELBAU GMBH [DE]); | [XI]WO2012041578 (INGUN PRUEFMITTELBAU GMBH [DE], et al); | [XI]US2015280370 (HUANG TUNG-LIANG [TW], et al); | [A]CN206313241U (ELECTRICALLY CONNECTED TECH CO LTD) | by applicant | DE202010007227U |