EP3706732 - NEW USES OF LIPOPHENOLIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | 13.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de Montpellier 163, rue Auguste Broussonnet 34090 Montpellier / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique - CNRS 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states Ecole Nationale Supérieure de Chimie 240 Avenue du Professeur Émile Jeanbrau 34090 Montpellier / FR | For all designated states Institut de Recherche pour le Développement (IRD) Immeuble le Sextant 44, Bd de Dunkerque CS 90009 13002 Marseille 2 / FR | For all designated states Universite d'Aix-Marseille 58 boulevard Charles Livon 13007 Marseille / FR | For all designated states Université Côte d'Azur Grand Château 28 avenue Valrose 06100 Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | For all designated states Université de Montpellier 163, rue Auguste Broussonnet 34090 Montpellier / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique - CNRS 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Ecole Nationale Supérieure de Chimie 240 Avenue du Professeur Émile Jeanbrau 34090 Montpellier / FR | |||
For all designated states Institut de Recherche pour le Développement (IRD) Immeuble le Sextant 44, Bd de Dunkerque CS 90009 13002 Marseille 2 / FR | |||
For all designated states Universite d'Aix-Marseille 58 boulevard Charles Livon 13007 Marseille / FR | |||
For all designated states Université Côte d'Azur Grand Château 28 avenue Valrose 06100 Nice / FR | |||
Former [2020/38] | For all designated states Université de Montpellier 163, rue Auguste Broussonnet 34090 Montpellier / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique - CNRS 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Ecole Nationale Supérieure de Chimie 240 Avenue du Professeur Émile Jeanbrau 34090 Montpellier / FR | |||
For all designated states Institut de Recherche pour le Développement (IRD) Immeuble le Sextant 44, Bd de Dunkerque CS 90009 13002 Marseille 2 / FR | |||
For all designated states Universite d'Aix-Marseille 58 boulevard Charles Livon 13007 Marseille / FR | |||
For all designated states COMMUNAUTE UNIVERSITES ET ETABLISSEMENTS UNIVERSITE COTE D'AZUR Grand Chateau 28 Avenue Valrose 06100 Nice / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAUSTE, Céline 577 rue de Centrayrargues 34070 Montpellier / FR | 02 /
VERCAUTEREN, Joseph 301 chemin de Caylus 34170 Castelnau Le Lez / FR | 03 /
VEAS, Fransisco Mas Abrigas Route de Baillargues 34130 Mauguio / FR | 04 /
DURAND, Thierry 2 rue Pierre Boissier 34070 Montpellier / FR | 05 /
BLONDEAU, Nicolas 185 route de Saint Pierre de Féric 06000 Nice / FR | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 18796967.0 | 12.11.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018EP80915 | Priority number, date | EP20170306560 | 10.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17306560 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019092239 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3706732 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/23, A61K31/231, A61K31/232, C07C69/22, C07C69/587, A61P9/14 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
A61K31/23 (EP);
A61K31/235 (US);
A61K31/231 (EP);
A61K31/232 (EP);
C07C69/22 (EP);
C07C69/587 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | NEUE VERWENDUNGEN VON LIPOPHENOLEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2020/38] | English: | NEW USES OF LIPOPHENOLIC COMPOUNDS | [2020/38] | French: | NOUVELLES UTILISATIONS DE COMPOSÉS LIPOPHÉNOLIQUES | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 19.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9323075 (ONCOLOGIX INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claim - *; | [X]WO2005069998 (UNIV BRIGHAM YOUNG [US], et al) [X] 14 * page 35, lines 5-6,15; claim 22 * * pages 8, 45 *; | [Y]WO2006123178 (IMMUNOCLIN LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claim - *; | [XY]WO2015162265 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [X] 1-12 * pages 24-28; claim - * [Y] 1-15; | [X] - Pany, "PKC Activation by Resveratrol Derivatives with Unsaturated Aliphatic Chain", PLoS ONE 7(12): e52888. doi:10.1371/ journal.pone.0052888, (20121221), URL: http://journals.plos.org/plosone/article/file?id=10.1371/journal.pone.0052888&type=printable, (20180227), XP055454605 [X] 14 * page 2; figure 1 * | [Y] - Fulgenzi, "In Vivo Inhibition of TNFa-Induced Vascular Permeability by Resveratrol", Transplantation Proceedings, 33, 2341-2343 (2001), (20010101), pages 2341 - 2343, URL: https://ac.els-cdn.com/S0041134501020152/1-s2.0-S0041134501020152-main.pdf?_tid=spdf-19d3c9c1-b684-4146-a68b-3bea3abf418e&acdnat=1519659657_0f2067fceb86ebca0128169f609cde59, (20180226), XP055454461 [Y] 1-15 * page 2342 * | [Y] - NADIA CALABRISO ET AL, "Red Grape Skin Polyphenols Blunt Matrix Metalloproteinase-2 and -9 Activity and Expression in Cell Models of Vascular Inflammation: Protective Role in Degenerative and Inflammatory Diseases", MOLECULES, (20160829), vol. 21, no. 12, doi:10.3390/molecules21091147, page 1147, XP055454556 [Y] 1-15 * pages 7-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/molecules21091147 | [Y] - LEE BEOBYI ET AL, "Resveratrol inhibits TNF-alpha-induced proliferation and matrix metalloproteinase expression in human vascular smooth muscle cells", THE JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR NUTRITION, US, (20051201), vol. 135, no. 12, ISSN 0022-3166, pages 2767 - 2773, XP009503755 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [XP] - ALY SHAMSEDDIN ET AL, "Resveratrol-Linoleate protects from exacerbated endothelial permeability via a drastic inhibition of the MMP-9 activity", BIOSCIENCE REPORTS, US, (20180619), vol. 38, no. 4, doi:10.1042/BSR20171712, ISSN 0144-8463, XP055540761 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BSR20171712 | by applicant | - BERGE et al., "Pharmacologically acceptable salts", J. Pharm. Sd, (19770000), vol. 66, page 1 | - BLASI, E.; BARLUZZI, R.; BOCCHINI, V. et al., "Immortalization of murine microglial cells by a v-raf/v-myc carrying retrovirus", J. Neuroimmunol., (19900000), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1016/0165-5728(90)90073-V, pages 229 - 237, XP024016435 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-5728(90)90073-V | - CHENG, G.; X. ZHANG; D. GAO; X. JIANG; W. DONG, "Resveratrol inhibits MMP-9 expression by up-regulating PPAR alpha expression in an oxygen glucose deprivation-exposed neuron model", Neurosci Lett, (20090000), vol. 451, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.neulet.2008.12.045, pages 105 - 108, XP025922025 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neulet.2008.12.045 | - CRAUSTE, C.; C. VIGOR; P. BRABET; M. PICQ; M. LAGARDE; C. HAMEL; T. DURAND; J. VERCAUTEREN, "Synthesis and Evaluation of Polyunsaturated Fatty Acid-Phenol Conjugates as Anti-Carbonyl-Stress Lipophenols", European Journal Of Organic Chemistry, (20140000), doi:doi:10.1002/ejoc.201402282, pages 4548 - 4561, XP055454417 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejoc.201402282 | - DELAUNAY, J. C.; C. CASTAGNINO; C. CHEZE; J. VERCAUTEREN, "Preparative isolation of polyphenolic compounds from Vitis vinifera by centrifugal partition chromatography", J Chromatogr A, (20020000), vol. 964, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(02)00355-2, pages 123 - 128, XP004368694 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(02)00355-2 | - GAO, D.; T. HUANG; X. JIANG; S. HU; L. ZHANG; Z. FEI, "Resveratrol protects primary cortical neuron cultures from transient oxygen-glucose deprivation by inhibiting MMP-9", Mol Med Rep, (20140000), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 2197 - 2204 | - LUPLERTLOP N. et al., "Dengue-virus-infected dendritic cells trigger vascular leakage through metalloproteinase overproduction (vol 7, pg 1176, 2006", Embo Rep., (20060000), vol. 7, no. 12, page 1290 | - MARSAC D et al., "Infection of human monocyte-derived dendritic cells by ANDES Hantavirus enhances proinflammatory state, the secretion of acive MMP-9 and indirectly enhances endothelial permeability", Virol J., (20110000), page 8 | - MISSE D. et al., "HIV-1 glycoprotein 120 includes the MMP-9 cytopathogenic factor production that is abolished by inhibition of the p38 mitogen-activated protein kinase signaling pathway", Blood, (20010000), vol. 98, no. 3, pages 541 - 7 | - MOSMANN, T., "Rapid colorimetric assay for cellular growth and survival: application to proliferation and cytotoxicity assays", J Immunol Methods, (19830000), vol. 65, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-1759(83)90303-4, pages 55 - 63, XP023973702 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(83)90303-4 | - WALLE, T., "Bioavailability of resveratrol", Ann N Y Acad Sci, (20110000), vol. 1215, pages 9 - 15 |