EP3691529 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BASIS MATERIAL DECOMPOSITION WITH A GENERAL PHYSICAL CONSTRAINT FOR MULTI-ENERGY COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCOLLOUGH, Cynthia H. 5281 Roselee Circle NW Byron MN 55920-4010 / US | 02 /
LENG, Shuai 4041 Stone Point Drive NE Rochester MN 55906 / US | 03 /
LI, Zhoubo 521 S. Butterfield Road Libertyville IL 60048-2519 / US | 04 /
YU, Lifeng 1605 Ancaster Drive Byron MN 55920-1557 / US | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 18797238.5 | 08.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018US54855 | Priority number, date | US201762568988P | 06.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762568988 P | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019071256 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3691529 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3691529 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, G01N23/087, G01N23/046, G06T11/00, G01V5/00 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
A61B6/482 (EP,US);
A61B6/4241 (EP);
A61B6/481 (EP);
A61B6/5205 (EP);
A61B6/5217 (EP);
A61B6/583 (EP);
G01N23/046 (EP);
G01N23/087 (EP);
G01V5/224 (EP);
G01V5/226 (EP);
G06T11/008 (EP,US);
G16H30/40 (US);
G16H50/30 (EP);
G01N2223/206 (EP);
G01N2223/419 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GRUNDMATERIALZERSETZUNG MIT EINER ALLGEMEINEN PHYSIKALISCHEN BESCHRÄNKUNG FÜR MEHRENERGIE-COMPUTERTOMOGRAPHIE | [2020/33] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BASIS MATERIAL DECOMPOSITION WITH A GENERAL PHYSICAL CONSTRAINT FOR MULTI-ENERGY COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY | [2020/33] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCOMPOSITION DE MATÉRIAU DE BASE AVEC UNE CONTRAINTE PHYSIQUE GÉNÉRALE POUR TOMODENSITOMÉTRIE (TDM) MULTIÉNERGIE | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 28.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2018 | AL | 06.07.2022 | AT | 06.07.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | CY | 06.07.2022 | CZ | 06.07.2022 | DK | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | ES | 06.07.2022 | FI | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | IT | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | MK | 06.07.2022 | MT | 06.07.2022 | PL | 06.07.2022 | RO | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SE | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SK | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.10.2022 | GR | 07.10.2022 | GB | 08.10.2022 | IE | 08.10.2022 | LU | 08.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | FR | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | PT | 07.11.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 08.10.2018 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
IT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
MK | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
GB | 08.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 08.10.2018 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
IT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
MK | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
GB | 08.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 08.10.2018 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
IT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
GB | 08.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
IT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
GB | 08.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
IT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
GB | 08.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
GB | 08.10.2022 | ||
IE | 08.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
GB | 08.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 06.07.2022 | |
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009102996 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0083] *; | [X]WO2016171570 (MARS BIOIMAGING LTD [NZ]) [X] 1,5 * page 47, line 12 and 20 *; | [XY] - LI ZHOUBO ET AL, "Image-based material decomposition with a general volume constraint for photon-counting CT", PROGRESS IN BIOMEDICAL OPTICS AND IMAGING, SPIE - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, BELLINGHAM, WA, US, (20150318), vol. 9412, doi:10.1117/12.2082069, ISSN 1605-7422, ISBN 978-1-5106-0027-0, pages 94120T - 94120T, XP060050933 [X] 1-8 * Section 2.4, first paragraph; section 2.1, paragraph "Noise magnification ...."; section 2.2 * [Y] 1,2,5,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2082069 | [X] - LIU XIN ET AL, "Quantitative imaging of element composition and mass fraction using dual-energy CT: Three-material decomposition", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20090410), vol. 36, no. 5, doi:10.1118/1.3097632, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 1602 - 1609, XP012129992 [X] 1,5 * equation 5; Section II.A.2.; fig. 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.3097632 |