EP3621490 - PORTABLE REBOUNDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rocking, Inc. 200 Spectrum Dr. Suite 300 Irvine, California 92618 / US | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DJANKOVICH, Mladen 103 Pacer Irvine, California 92618 / US | 02 /
DJANKOVICH, Milena 103 Pacer Irvine, California 92618 / US | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | K&L Gates LLP Friedrichstraße 110 A 10117 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/12] | Secerna LLP The Old Fire Station 18 Clifford Street York YO1 9RD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18797637.8 | 11.05.2018 | [2020/12] | WO2018US32453 | Priority number, date | US201762505834P | 12.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762505834 P | US201862645901P | 21.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862645901 P | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018209316 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3621490 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/42, A47C20/02, A47C3/02 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
A47C3/02 (EP,US);
A47C20/027 (EP);
A47C7/425 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/12] | A47C3/02, A47C7/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE PRALLVORRICHTUNG | [2020/12] | English: | PORTABLE REBOUNDING DEVICE | [2020/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REBOND PORTABLE | [2020/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 10.08.2020 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 03.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 12.10.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 12.10.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1215467 (BEARFIELD THOMAS N [US]); | [X]US2013169017 (MASUNAGA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [X]US2013345028 (BES CLAUDE [FR]) | International search | [X]US5352173 (MCLAUGHLIN GARY G [US]) [X] 1* Entire document. *; | [X]US6132338 (SHIFFERAW TESSEMA D [US]) [X] 1-3, 9 * Entire document. *; | [X]US2004164219 (RIVERA RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-3, 10-11 * Entire document. *; | [X]US2013169017 (MASUNAGA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * Entire document, especially para [0118]-[0121], [0128]-[0133], figs. 1-3 and 6-8. *; | [X]US2013345028 (BES CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1, 12 * Entire document, especially para [0049]-[0054] and figs. 1-2. * |