EP3635086 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR THE PREPARATION OF ETHANOL-CONTAINING BEVERAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEXT CENTURY SPIRITS, LLC 5237 Capital Blvd. Raleigh NC 27616 / US | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAWLAK, Joel Justin 8929 Winged Thistle Ct. Raleigh North Carolina 27617 / US | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Straße 1 80335 München / DE | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18797980.2 | 09.05.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018US31844 | Priority number, date | US201762503652P | 09.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762503652 P | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018208946 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3635086 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/14, C12G3/07, C12H1/22 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
C12G3/07 (EP,KR,US);
C12G3/06 (US);
C12G3/04 (US);
C12H1/22 (EP,US);
C12H1/08 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/16] | C12G3/04, C12G3/06, G01N25/14, C10G1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZUBEREITUNG VON ETHANOLHALTIGEN GETRÄNKEN | [2020/16] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR THE PREPARATION OF ETHANOL-CONTAINING BEVERAGES | [2020/16] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE BOISSONS CONTENANT DE L'ÉTHANOL | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 28.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/47] | 18.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2132435 (REIMAN CLARENCE K) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,12,13 * page 1, column l, line 1 - line 17; claim 5 * * page 3, column r, line 30 - page 4, column l, line 20 * * page 4, column l, line 21 - line 49 * [I] 2,5,10,11,14,15; | [A]US2003035856 (VICKERS MARCUS LADON [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [XY]US2027099 (HOCHWALT CARROLL A, et al) [X] 1, 51, 53/51, 54/53/51, 55/54/53/51, 56/51, 57/56/51, 58/57/56/51, 59/58/57/56/51, 60/56/51, 61/60/56/51, 62/61/60/56/51, 63/61/60/56/51, and 63/62/61/60/56/51 * ; column 1, lines 1-16; column 2, lines 1-4; 27-28, 45-51 * [Y] 2, 3/1-2, 4/1-2, 5/1-2, 16-17, 18/16-17, 42-43, 44/42-43, 45/44/42-43, 46-47, 52, 53/52, 56/52, 57/56/52, 56/52, 57/56/52, 56/52, 57/56/52, 56/52, 57/56/52, 58/57/56/52, 59/58/57/56/52, 60/56/52, 61/6; | [Y]US4265860 (JENNINGS WALTER G, et al) [Y] 16-17, 18/16-17, 42-43, 44/42-43, 45/44/42-43, 46-47, 52, 53/52, 54/53/52, 55/54/53/52, 56/52, 57/56/52, 58/57/56/52, 59/58/57/56/52, 60/56/52, 61/60/56/52,62/61/60/56/52, 63/61/60/56/52, and 63/62/61 * ; figure 1; abstract; column 3, lines 25-55 *; | [Y]US6506430 (ZIMLICH III JOSEPH A [US], et al) [Y] 17, 18/17, 42-43, 44/42-43, 45/44/42-43, 46-47* ; column 3, lines 6-13; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2017036974 (PETERSON DEVIN GRANT [US], et al) [Y] 2, 3/1-2, 4/1-2, 5/1-2 * ; paragraphs [0043], [0046], [0192], [0238] * |