EP3625229 - SOLID FORMS OF BERBERINE URSODEOXYCHOLATE AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Correction of patent specification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Hightide Biopharmaceutical Ltd. Unit 02 1st Floor Building 18B Zhonghaixin Innovation Industrial City No. 11, Ganli 2nd Road Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Meng Unit 02 1st Floor Building 18B Zhonghaixin Innovation Industrial City No. 11 Ganli 2nd Road Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Liping Unit 02 1st Floor Building 18B Zhonghaixin Innovation Industrial City No. 11 Ganli 2nd Road Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
FU, Xinxiang Unit 02 1st Floor Building 18B Zhonghaixin Innovation Industrial City No. 11 Ganli 2nd Road Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18798004.0 | 11.05.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018CN86461 | Priority number, date | CN201710335467 | 12.05.2017 Original published format: CN201710335467 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018205987 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3625229 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3625229 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3625229 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07J9/00, C07D455/03, A61K31/437, A61K31/575, A61P1/16, A61P3/04, A61P3/06, A61P3/10 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/437 (EP,EA);
C07J9/005 (EP,CN,EA,KR);
C07D455/03 (EP,CN,EA,KR);
A61K31/4745 (US);
A61K31/575 (EP,EA,KR);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,KR);
A61P25/28 (KR);
A61P3/00 (KR);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (KR);
C07D491/147 (US);
C07J9/00 (US);
C07B2200/13 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/437, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/575, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/13] | C07D455/03, A61K31/4375 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTE FORMEN VON BERBERINURSODEOXYCHOLAT SOWIE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/16] | English: | SOLID FORMS OF BERBERINE URSODEOXYCHOLATE AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS THEREOF | [2020/13] | French: | FORMES SOLIDES DE BERBÉRINE URSODÉSOXYCHOLATE, COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2020/13] |
Former [2020/13] | FESTE FORMEN VON BERBERIN-URSODESOXYCHOLAT UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 12.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23167629.7 / EP4234568 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]WO2016015634 (SHENZHEN HIGHTIDE BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LTD [CN]); | [XI]CN105693805 (HEFEI HUAFANG PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) | International search | [A]CN102229636 (UNIV NORTHEAST FORESTRY, et al); | [A]WO2016015634 (SHENZHEN HIGHTIDE BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LTD [CN]); | [X]CN105693805 (HEFEI HUAFANG PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]US2016199391 (ANDRALI SHIVA SREENATH [US], et al) |