EP3624313 - DYNAMO-ELECTRIC MACHINE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsuba Corporation 2681, Hirosawa-cho 1-chome Kiryu-shi, Gunma 376-8555 / JP | For all designated states Shindengen Electric Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 2-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2020/12] | For all designated states Mitsuba Corporation 2681, Hirosawa-cho 1-chome Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-8555 / JP | ||
For all designated states Shindengen Electric Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 2-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAI, Masaki c/o MITSUBA Corporation 2681 Hirosawa-cho 1-chome Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-8555 / JP | 02 /
HAGIMURA, Masami c/o MITSUBA Corporation 2681 Hirosawa-cho 1-chome Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-8555 / JP | 03 /
TSUCHIYA, Yuichi c/o MITSUBA Corporation 2681 Hirosawa-cho 1-chome Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-8555 / JP | 04 /
OKANO, Toshifumi c/o SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. Factory 10-13 Minami-cho Hanno-shi Saitama 357-8585 / JP | 05 /
INTO, Toru c/o SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. Factory 10-13 Minami-cho Hanno-shi Saitama 357-8585 / JP | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 18799108.8 | 03.04.2018 | [2020/12] | WO2018JP14333 | Priority number, date | JP20170094208 | 10.05.2017 Original published format: JP 2017094208 | [2020/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018207505 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624313 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/20, H02K9/02, H02K11/33, F02N15/00, F02N11/08, F01P1/06, H02K9/04, // F02N11/00, H02K29/06 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
F02N15/006 (EP,US);
F01P1/02 (EP);
F01P1/06 (EP);
F01P5/02 (EP);
F02N11/0859 (EP);
H02K11/33 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/12] | H02K5/20, H02K9/02, H02K11/33 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Title | German: | DYNAMO-ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINENEINHEIT | [2020/12] | English: | DYNAMO-ELECTRIC MACHINE UNIT | [2020/12] | French: | UNITÉ DE MACHINE DYNAMO-ÉLECTRIQUE | [2020/12] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2019 | Translation filed | 03.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 10.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009240071 (MITSUBA CORP); | [XI]JP2013072358 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [XI]WO2016084590 (MITSUBA CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2016167963 (DENSO TRIM KK) | International search | [Y]JP2009214813 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 6-11* , paragraph [0040], fig. 8 & US 2009/0229944 A1, paragraph [0083], fig. 8 *; | [XY]JP2013072358 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0052]-[0107], fig. 1-9 & CN 103032244 A * [Y] 6-11 | by applicant | JP2016111909 | JP2017094208 |