EP3623378 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CYCLIC ORGANIC COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOMMA, Akie c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1 Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | 02 /
HOU, Zengye c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1 Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Hisashi c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1 Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | 04 /
SASAKURA, Kiyoshi c/o CHUGAI PHARMA MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. 5-1 Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 18799344.9 | 11.05.2018 | [2020/12] | WO2018JP18265 | Priority number, date | JP20170095261 | 12.05.2017 Original published format: JP 2017095261 | [2020/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018207904 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3623378 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/64, C07K7/50, B01J19/18 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
B01J19/0033 (EP,US);
C07K7/50 (KR);
C07K1/06 (US);
B01J19/18 (EP,US);
C07K1/02 (US);
C07K7/64 (KR);
C07K7/645 (US);
G16C20/10 (EP,KR);
G16C20/30 (KR);
B01J2219/00006 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00164 (EP);
B01J2219/002 (EP,US);
C07D513/08 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/12] | C07K7/64, C07K7/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER CYCLISCHEN ORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNG | [2020/12] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING CYCLIC ORGANIC COMPOUND | [2020/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSÉ ORGANIQUE CYCLIQUE | [2020/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2019 | Translation filed | 10.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 06.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0729944 (DSM NV [NL], et al); | [I]EP2119718 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [XDI]WO2013156600 (VITO [BE]); | International search | [XY]WO2013156600 (VITO [BE]) [X] 1 * , pp. 7-8, claims 1-22 & JP 2015-514576 A & US 2015/0050706 A1 & EP 2838643 A1 & CN 104245096 A * [Y] 1-15; | [XY] - MONFETTE, SEBASTIEN et al., "Getting Ring-Closing Metathesis off the Bench: Reaction-Reactor Matching Transforms Metathesis Efficiency in the Assembly of Large Rings", Chem. Eur. J., (20100000), vol. 16, pages 11720 - 11725, XP055563104 [X] 1 * , see abstract, table 1 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.201001210 | [XY] - TRASOBARES, SUSANA et al., "Upgrading of a Petroleum Residue. Kinetics of Conradson Carbon Residue Conversion", Ind. Eng. Chem. Res., (19990000), vol. 38, pages 938 - 943, XP055563106 [X] 1 * , see abstract, pp. 939-942 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie980285c | [Y] - SUDA, ATSUSHI et al., "Design and Synthesis of novel macrocyclic 2-amino-6-arylpyrimidine Hsp90 inhibitors", Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20120000), vol. 22, pages 1136 - 1141, XP028438496 [Y] 1-15 * , see abstract, scheme 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.11.100 | [A] - KUMAR, AN et al., "Molecular Weight Distribution of Polyethylene Terephthalate in Homogeneous, Continuous-Flow-Stirred Tank Reactors", Polymer Engineering and Science, (19820000), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 314 - 323, XP055563109 [A] 1-15 * , see pp. 316-317 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pen.760220508 | by applicant | JPS5235859B | WO9509142 | WO2006025859 | WO2006038088 | WO2007011459 | WO2008105526 | WO2010052559 | WO2012026566 | WO2012033154 | WO2012074130 | WO2013100132 | WO2013156600 | WO2013167703 | WO2014134922 | WO2014151634 | WO2015030014 | WO2018052002 | - A. SUDA et al., "Design and synthesis of novel macrocyclic 2-amino-6-arylpyrimidine Hsp90 inhibitors", Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20120000), vol. 22, doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.11.100, pages 1136 - 1141, XP029121683 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.11.100 | - J.SCHERKENBECK et al., "Cyclodepipeptides: A rich source of biologically active compounds for drug research", Molecules, (20140000), vol. 19, no. 8, page 12368 | - P.GERBAUXO.COULEMBIER et al., "Cyclic polymers by ring-closure strategies", Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20160000), vol. 55, page 13944 | - A.K.YUDIN, "Macrocycles: lesson from the distnt pst, recent developments, and future directions", Chem. Sci., (20150000), vol. 6, page 30 | - NORBERT SEWALD et al., "An improved method for the solution cyclization of peptides under pseudo-high dilution conditions", Journal of Biotechnology, (20040000), vol. 112, pages 73 - 77 | - "Chemical reaction engineering", KENJI HASHIMOTOBAIHUKANOCTAVE LEVENSPIEL, Hanno-kogaku (Reaction Engineering, Wiley, vol. 2 | - TIMOTHY D. WHITE et al., "Development of a Continuous Schotten-Baumann Route to an Acyl Sulfonamide", Org. Process Res. Dev., (20120000), vol. 16, no. 5, page 939 | - Comb Chem High Throughput Screen, (20100000), vol. 13, pages 75 - 87 | - Nature Chem. Bio., (20090000), vol. 5, page 502 | - Nat Chem Biol., (20090000), vol. 5, pages 888 - 90 | - Bioconjugate Chem., (20070000), vol. 18, pages 469 - 476 | - ChemBioChem, (20090000), vol. 10, pages 787 - 798 | - Chemical Communications, United Kingdom, (20110000), vol. 47, pages 9946 - 9958 | - M. KATO et al., "The intestinal first-pass metabolism of substances of CYP3A4 and P-glycoprotein-quantitative analysis based on information from the literature", Drug Metab. Pharmacokinet., (20030000), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 365 - 372 | - "Kaisetsu to Enshu (Explanation and Practice", Kagaku Kogaku (Chemical Engineering | - "12.5 Continuous Stirred Tank Reactor", Reaction Engineering, page 316 | - JAMES C. COLLINSKEITH JAMES, Med. Chem. Commun., (20120000), vol. 3, no. 12, pages 1489 - 1495 | - A. SUDA et al., Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20120000), vol. 22, pages 1136 - 1141 | - BERNARD RISSARNAUD GRANDEURYTHORSTEN GUTMANUELA SEEGER-WEIBELCHRISTIAN ZUERCHERJINJING LIFABRICE GALLOU, Org. Process Res. Dev., (20140000), vol. 18, pages 1763 - 1770 | - KESSLER et al., Helvetica Chimica Acta, (19850000), vol. 68, page 661 | - DOMINIC ORMERODBART NOTENMATTHIEU DORBECLARS ANDERSSONANITA BUEKENHOUDTLUDWIG GOETELEN, Org. Process Res. Dev., (20150000), vol. 19, pages 841 - 848 |