EP3707795 - POWER DISTRIBUTION UNIT AND FUSE MANAGEMENT FOR AN ELECTRIC MOBILE APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Intelligent Power Limited 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4 / IE | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENSCH, Martin Wayne 9157 SW Monterey Place Portland, OR 97225 / US | 02 /
FISHER, Brandon William 4300 SE 51st Ave. Portland, OR 97206 / US | 03 /
DOUGLASS, Robert Stephen 18718 Melrose Road Wildwood, MO 63038 / US | 04 /
ZURFACE, Austin Robert 6121 E. Butler Rd. Dowling, MI 49050 / US | 05 /
URIAN, Jeff Howard 4306 S Shore St Waterford, MI 48623 / US | 06 /
DAVID, James 5672 W. Heverly Drive Portage, MI 49024 / US | 07 /
SUDA, Bharath 301 Wing-1 Everglade Near Accolade Kharadi Pune 411014 Maharashtra / IN | 08 /
SONI, Asheesh B201 Peony Yogi Park Baner Pune 411045 Maharashtra / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2020/38] | 01 /
MENSCH, Martin Wayne 9157 SW Monterey Place Portland, OR 97225 / US | ||
02 /
FISHER, Brandon William 4300 SE 51st Ave. Portland, OR 97206 / US | |||
03 /
DOUGLASS, Robert Stephen 18718 Melrose Road Wildwood, MO 63038 / US | |||
04 /
ZURFACE, Austin Robert 6121 E. Butler Rd. Dowling, MI 49050 / US | |||
05 /
URIAN, Jeff Howard 6730 Fulton Ct. Troy, MI 48098 / US | |||
06 /
DAVID, James 5672 W. Heverly Drive Portage, MI 49024 / US | |||
07 /
SUDA, Bharath 301 Wing-1 Everglade Near Accolade Kharadi Pune 411014 Maharashtra / IN | |||
08 /
SONI, Asheesh B201 Peony Yogi Park Baner Pune 411045 Maharashtra / IN | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/38] | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18800137.4 | 08.11.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018EP80611 | Priority number, date | US201762583355P | 08.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762583355 P | US201762583367P | 08.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762583367 P | US201762583428P | 08.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762583428 P | IN201711039846 | 08.11.2017 Original published format: IN201711039846 | IN201711039847 | 08.11.2017 Original published format: IN201711039847 | IN201711039848 | 08.11.2017 Original published format: IN201711039848 | IN201711039849 | 08.11.2017 Original published format: IN201711039849 | IN201711039850 | 08.11.2017 Original published format: IN201711039850 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019092103 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3707795 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/087, H01H39/00, B60L3/04 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
B60L3/04 (EP,CN,US);
H02H3/08 (EP,CN,US);
B60L58/21 (EP,US);
B60L3/0023 (EP);
B60L50/64 (EP,US);
B60L58/25 (CN,US);
H01H85/0241 (EP,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,US);
H02H3/087 (EP,US);
H02H9/00 (US);
H01H39/00 (US);
H01H50/021 (EP);
H01H85/46 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (US);
H01M50/204 (EP,US);
H01M50/505 (EP,US);
H02H3/05 (EP);
H02H3/085 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | ENERGIEVERTEILUNGSEINHEIT UND SICHERUNGSVERWALTUNG FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE MOBILE ANWENDUNG | [2020/38] | English: | POWER DISTRIBUTION UNIT AND FUSE MANAGEMENT FOR AN ELECTRIC MOBILE APPLICATION | [2020/38] | French: | UNITÉ DE DISTRIBUTION D'ÉNERGIE ET GESTION DE FUSIBLES POUR APPLICATION MOBILE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 01.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH10322880 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 30,35-37 * paragraphs [0018] - [0027]; figures 1-3 *[I] 31-34,38-40; | [XI]JP2001078350 (TAIHEIYO SEIKO KK) [X] 8-10 * abstract * [I] 11-14; | [X]US2008137253 (GEORGE TERRY A [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0023] , [0027] , [0028]; figure 3 *; | [XI]DE102009023801 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0015] - [0020]; figures 1,2 * [I] 4-7; | [X]US2013062724 (TOKUYAMA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0118] - [0135]; figures 16-17 *; | [I]US2013154352 (TOKARZ NICHOLAS PAUL [US], et al) [I] 1,4-6 * paragraphs [0030] - [0034]; figures 6-8 *; | [XI]US2014009162 (BARRENSCHEEN JENS [DE], et al) [X] 15-17 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 25] - [0035]; figures 1,2,3 * [I] 18-24; | [I]DE102012224223 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [I] 15,16 * paragraphs [0023] - [0034]; figures 1,2 *; | [I]US2014316735 (JAO TONG-CHENG [TW], et al) [I] 25 * paragraphs [0034] - [0037]; figure 3 *; | [XAI]JP2016205866 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [X] 25-27 * paragraphs [0028] - [0036]; figures 1,2 * [A] 29 [I] 28; | [A]FR3041143 (MERSEN FRANCE SB SAS [FR]) [A] 4-7 * pages 5-8; figure 1 * |