EP3537385 - PROGRAM, INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOBONICHI CO., LTD. 9F, Stadium Place Aoyama 2-9-5, Kita-Aoyama Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOI, Shigesato c/o HOBONICHI CO., LTD. 9F, Stadium Place Aoyama 2-9-5, Kita-Aoyama Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-0061 / JP | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 18800458.4 | 06.04.2018 | [2019/37] | WO2018JP14821 | Priority number, date | JP20180006763 | 18.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018006763 | [2019/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019142369 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3537385 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06T19/00, G06F3/0488, G06F3/147 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
G06F3/04886 (EP,BR,US);
G06T1/00 (BR);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
G06T11/60 (US);
G06F16/51 (CN);
G06F3/14 (US);
G06F3/147 (EP,US);
G06T19/006 (KR);
G06V20/20 (CN);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/0486 (US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
G06T2207/30204 (KR);
G09G2354/00 (EP,US);
H04L67/01 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/37] | G06T19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROGRAMM, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/39] | English: | PROGRAM, INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD | [2019/37] | French: | PROGRAMME, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2019/37] |
Former [2019/37] | PROGRAMM, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSMETHODE | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2018 | Translation filed | 22.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 22.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/04] | 11.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015153934 (ZHEREBTSOV NIKOLAY [CH], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] ** paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-5 *; | [I] - SANGCHUL AHN ET AL, "Webizing mobile augmented reality content", NEW REVIEW OF HYPERMEDIA AND MULTIMEDIA, GB, (20140102), vol. 20, no. 1, doi:10.1080/13614568.2013.857727, ISSN 1361-4568, pages 79 - 100, XP055657187 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/13614568.2013.857727 | International search | [Y]JP2005284882 (SHARP KK) [Y] 1-9, 13-15, 18-20 * , paragraphs [0067], [0136] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013161103 (TMDANCE CORP) [Y] 5-9, 15 * , paragraph [0026] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015090664 (NTT DOCOMO INC) [Y] 3-9, 14-15 * , paraaraphs GAMMA00121, GAMMA00201 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2016517054 (FACEBOOK, INC.) [Y] 9 * , paragraph [0027] & US 2014/0229862 A1, paragraph [0032] & WO 2014/126949 A1 & CA 2900274 A1, @@@ *; | [Y]JP2017117082 (KONICA MINOLTA INC) [Y] 1-9, 13-15, 18-20 * , paragraphs [0036]-[0038], [0042], [0062], [0063], fig. 8 (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2017522682 (YOUNGZONE CULTURE (SHANGHAI) CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-9, 13-15, 18-20 * , paragraphs [0062], [0067], [0068] & US 2017/0004651 A1, paragraphs [0082], [0086] & WO 2016/011788 A1 & CN 104102412 A * [A] 10-12, 16-17; | [A] - SATO, NOBUHIKO, "This AR Learning Globe Makes a Perfect Back-to-School Gift: ''Orboot"", (20170303), pages 1 - 5, CNET , URL: https://japan.cnet.com/article/35097547/, XP055614982 [A] 1-20 * , where the Images Pop Up from the Surface of the Earth.) * | by applicant | JP2013092407 |