EP3930794 - A CONTAINER FOR AT LEAST A FIRST INJECTABLE MEDICAMENT AND INJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEMM, Thomas c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
KLEMM, Thomas 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Representative(s) | Weilnau, Carsten, et al Patentanwälte Sturm Weilnau Franke Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 (Haus C-Süd) 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 18800672.0 | 19.11.2018 | [2022/01] | WO2018EP81705 | Priority number, date | EP20170306610 | 21.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17306610 | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019101672 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3930794 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, A61M5/28, A61M5/315, A61M5/178, A61M5/19 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
A61M5/2459 (EP,US);
A61M5/19 (EP,US);
A61M5/2425 (EP,US);
A61M5/2448 (EP);
A61M5/286 (EP);
A61M5/31596 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR MINDESTENS EIN ERSTES INJIZIERBARES MEDIKAMENT UND INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/01] | English: | A CONTAINER FOR AT LEAST A FIRST INJECTABLE MEDICAMENT AND INJECTION DEVICE | [2022/01] | French: | RÉCIPIENT POUR AU MOINS UN PREMIER MÉDICAMENT INJECTABLE ET DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/01] | 23.06.2020 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 23.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2022/01] | 07.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 16.07.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 16.07.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 16.07.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 16.07.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH08238324 (NISSHO KK) [X] 1 * figure - * [Y] 2-16; | [XY]WO0170309 (ANTARES PHARMA INC [US]) [X] 1 * figure 2 * [Y] 2-16; | [XY]DE10137962 (ROESCH AG MEDIZINTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1 * page 10, line 12 - page 11, line 8; figure 3 * [Y] 2-16; | [XY]US2008114304 (NALESSO FEDERICO [IT], et al) [X] 1 * figure 10 * [Y] 2-16; | [IY]WO2017089280 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [I] 1 * figures 2,7A-7C * [Y] 2-16; | [XY]US2017203051 (MODI PANKAJ [CA], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2-4 * [Y] 2-16; | [XP]US2018099100 (NAZZARO DAVID [US]) [XP] 1-16* figure - * |